Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2267 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gallegos S.B. No. 2267
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 29, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 3,
 Nays 1; April 29, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility for an award through the Early High School
 Graduation Scholarship program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 56.203, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (e) and adding Subsection (f) to read
 as follows:
 (a) To be eligible for an award through the Early High
 School Graduation Scholarship program, a person must:
 (1) have graduated from a public high school in this
 state:
 (A) in not more than 41 consecutive months and
 successfully completed the recommended or advanced high school
 program established under Section 28.025, if the person graduated
 on or after September 1, 2005;
 (B) in not more than 46 consecutive months, with
 at least 30 hours of college credit, and successfully completed the
 recommended or advanced high school program established under
 Section 28.025, if the person graduated on or after September 1,
 2005; or
 (C) in not more than 36 consecutive months after
 successfully completing the requirements for a high school diploma,
 if the person graduated before September 1, 2005, regardless of
 whether the person successfully completed the recommended or
 advanced high school program established under Section 28.025;
 (2) have attended one or more public high schools in
 this state for the majority of time the person attended high school,
 except as provided by Subsection (f); and
 (3) except as provided by Subsection (f), be a citizen
 of the United States or otherwise lawfully authorized to be present
 in the United States.
 (e) The coordinating board shall adopt rules for
 determining whether a person attended public high school in this
 state as required by Subsection (a)(2) and for determining under
 Subsection (f)(2) whether a person attended a high school other
 than a public high school in this state primarily because of the
 migratory agricultural or fishing work of the person, the person's
 parent, or the person's spouse. The coordinating board may adopt
 other rules the board considers necessary for the administration of
 Subsection (f).
 (f)  A person described by Subsection (a)(1)(A) or (B) who is
 otherwise eligible for an award and who is a migratory child, as
 defined by 20 U.S.C. Section 6399, is eligible for an award through
 the Early High School Graduation Scholarship program despite the
 student's inability to satisfy Subsection (a)(2) or (3) if:
 (1)  the person graduates from a public high school in
 this state; and
 (2)  the person attended one or more high schools,
 other than a public high school in this state, for one or more
 periods primarily because of the migratory agricultural or fishing
 work of the person, the person's parent, or the person's spouse, and
 the person would have satisfied Subsection (a)(2) if the person had
 attended a public high school in this state during that period or
 those periods.
 SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a student who graduates from a public high school in this state on
 or after the effective date of this Act. A student who graduates
 from a public high school in this state before the effective date of
 this Act and the student's eligibility to participate in the Early
 High School Graduation Scholarship program is governed by the law
 in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *