E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6900
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4995
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4995
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4996
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6211
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6210
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4845
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4672
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4672
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6011
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6011
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6030
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6030
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6030
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4571
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4571
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 4571
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4567
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4194
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1376
|
Journal Page: 5144
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5144
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5144
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5092
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Paxton
|
Journal Page: 5092
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5092
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4355
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2295
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2295
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1926
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1435
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1435
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1435
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1298
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 798
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|