1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 2274 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the authority of a school district to impose ad valorem |
---|
6 | 6 | | taxes. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 26.08, Tax Code, is amended by adding |
---|
9 | 9 | | Subsection (p) to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | (p) Notwithstanding Subsections (i), (n), and (o), if for |
---|
11 | 11 | | the preceding tax year the district adopted a maintenance and |
---|
12 | 12 | | operations tax rate that was less than the district's effective |
---|
13 | 13 | | maintenance and operations tax rate for that preceding tax year, |
---|
14 | 14 | | the rollback tax rate of the district for the current tax year is |
---|
15 | 15 | | calculated as if the district adopted a maintenance and operations |
---|
16 | 16 | | tax rate for the preceding tax year that was equal to the district's |
---|
17 | 17 | | effective maintenance and operations tax rate for that preceding |
---|
18 | 18 | | tax year. |
---|
19 | 19 | | SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 45.001, Education Code, |
---|
20 | 20 | | is amended to read as follows: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (a) The governing board of an independent school district, |
---|
22 | 22 | | including the city council or commission that has jurisdiction over |
---|
23 | 23 | | a municipally controlled independent school district, the |
---|
24 | 24 | | governing board of a rural high school district, and the |
---|
25 | 25 | | commissioners court of a county, on behalf of each common school |
---|
26 | 26 | | district under its jurisdiction, may: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (1) issue bonds for: |
---|
28 | 28 | | (A) the construction, acquisition, and equipment |
---|
29 | 29 | | of school buildings in the district; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (B) the acquisition of property or the |
---|
31 | 31 | | refinancing of property financed under a contract entered under |
---|
32 | 32 | | Subchapter A, Chapter 271, Local Government Code, regardless of |
---|
33 | 33 | | whether payment obligations under the contract are due in the |
---|
34 | 34 | | current year or a future year; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (C) the purchase of the necessary sites for |
---|
36 | 36 | | school buildings; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | (D) the purchase of new school buses; and |
---|
38 | 38 | | (2) may levy, pledge, assess, and collect annual ad |
---|
39 | 39 | | valorem taxes sufficient to pay the principal of and interest on the |
---|
40 | 40 | | bonds as or before the principal and interest become due, subject to |
---|
41 | 41 | | Section 45.003. |
---|
42 | 42 | | SECTION 3. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies |
---|
43 | 43 | | to the ad valorem tax rate of a school district beginning with the |
---|
44 | 44 | | 2009 tax year, except as provided by Subsection (b) of this section. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (b) If the governing body of a school district adopted an ad |
---|
46 | 46 | | valorem tax rate for the school district for the 2009 tax year |
---|
47 | 47 | | before the effective date of this Act, the change in law made by |
---|
48 | 48 | | this Act applies to the ad valorem tax rate of that school district |
---|
49 | 49 | | beginning with the 2010 tax year, and the law in effect when the tax |
---|
50 | 50 | | rate was adopted applies to the 2009 tax year with respect to that |
---|
51 | 51 | | school district. |
---|
52 | 52 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
53 | 53 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
54 | 54 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
55 | 55 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
56 | 56 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
57 | 57 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
58 | 58 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
59 | 59 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2274 passed the Senate on |
---|
60 | 60 | | April 24, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1; |
---|
61 | 61 | | May 30, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
62 | 62 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House |
---|
63 | 63 | | granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
64 | 64 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 30, |
---|
65 | 65 | | Nays 1. |
---|
66 | 66 | | ______________________________ |
---|
67 | 67 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
68 | 68 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2274 passed the House, with |
---|
69 | 69 | | amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, |
---|
70 | 70 | | Nays 0, one present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted request |
---|
71 | 71 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
72 | 72 | | May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
73 | 73 | | following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, two present not voting. |
---|
74 | 74 | | ______________________________ |
---|
75 | 75 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
76 | 76 | | Approved: |
---|
77 | 77 | | ______________________________ |
---|
78 | 78 | | Date |
---|
79 | 79 | | ______________________________ |
---|
80 | 80 | | Governor |
---|