Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2291 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R11735 JSC-D
 By: Lucio S.B. No. 2291


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation and support of community development
 corporations by the Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.096 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.096.  COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION PILOT
 PROGRAM. (a)  In this section, "community development corporation"
 means a private, nonprofit corporation organized to foster economic
 growth and revitalization, create small businesses, or develop
 affordable housing in a defined neighborhood or for a targeted
 population.
 (b)  Using existing resources, the department shall
 establish a pilot program to create and provide support for a
 regional community development corporation in a single rural area
 of this state.
 (c)  Not later than January 1, 2011, the department shall
 report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the members of the legislature
 regarding:
 (1)  the impact of the pilot program in the rural area
 in which it was implemented; and
 (2)  the feasibility and advisability of creating and
 supporting additional regional community development corporations
 to serve other areas of the state.
 (d) This section expires October 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter LL, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.934 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.934.  COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION FOR
 MIGRANT LABOR HOUSING FACILITIES. (a)  In this section, "community
 development corporation" means a private, nonprofit corporation
 organized to foster economic growth and revitalization, create
 small businesses, or develop affordable housing in a defined
 neighborhood or for a targeted population.
 (b)  Using existing resources, the department shall create a
 statewide community development corporation charged with
 developing, acquiring, and rehabilitating migrant labor housing
 facilities in appropriate areas in the state.
 (c)  The department shall work with the community
 development corporation to implement the findings and
 recommendations of the department in the report submitted under
 Section 2(f), Chapter 60 (H.B. 1099), Acts of the 79th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2005.
 SECTION 3. The Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs shall create the community development corporations
 required by this Act as soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, but not later than October 1, 2009.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.