1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 2298 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to compensation of certain state employees. |
---|
6 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Section 51.962, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
8 | 8 | | adding Subsection (f) to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 9 | | (f) This subsection applies to an employee employed by the |
---|
10 | 10 | | institution of higher education for more than six months. The |
---|
11 | 11 | | requirement that six months elapse between merit salary increases |
---|
12 | 12 | | prescribed by Subsection (e) does not apply to a one-time merit |
---|
13 | 13 | | payment if the chief administrative officer of the institution of |
---|
14 | 14 | | higher education determines in writing that the one-time merit |
---|
15 | 15 | | payment is made in relation to the employee's performance during a |
---|
16 | 16 | | natural disaster or other extraordinary circumstance. |
---|
17 | 17 | | SECTION 2. The heading to Section 659.0125, Government |
---|
18 | 18 | | Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
19 | 19 | | Sec. 659.0125. SALARY FOR DISTRICT JUDGE OR RETIRED JUDGE |
---|
20 | 20 | | PRESIDING OVER MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION. |
---|
21 | 21 | | SECTION 3. Section 659.0125, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
22 | 22 | | adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (c) A retired judge appointed to an MDL pretrial court, as |
---|
24 | 24 | | defined by Section 90.001, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, is |
---|
25 | 25 | | entitled to receive the same compensation and benefits to which a |
---|
26 | 26 | | district judge is entitled. |
---|
27 | 27 | | SECTION 4. Section 659.015, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
28 | 28 | | amending Subsection (g) and adding Subsections (i) and (j) to read |
---|
29 | 29 | | as follows: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (g) Compensatory time off to which an employee is entitled |
---|
31 | 31 | | under Subsection (f) must be taken during the 12-month period |
---|
32 | 32 | | following the end of the workweek in which the compensatory time was |
---|
33 | 33 | | accrued or it lapses. An employee may not be paid for that |
---|
34 | 34 | | compensatory time, except as provided by this subsection and |
---|
35 | 35 | | Subsections (i) and (j). An [However, an] employee of an |
---|
36 | 36 | | institution of higher education as defined by Section 61.003, |
---|
37 | 37 | | Education Code, or an employee engaged in a public safety activity, |
---|
38 | 38 | | including highway construction and maintenance or an emergency |
---|
39 | 39 | | response activity, may be paid at the employee's regular rate of pay |
---|
40 | 40 | | for that compensatory time if the employer determines that taking |
---|
41 | 41 | | the compensatory time off would disrupt normal teaching, research, |
---|
42 | 42 | | or other critical functions. |
---|
43 | 43 | | (i) With authorization from the administrative head of the |
---|
44 | 44 | | agency for which an employee works, or that person's designee, an |
---|
45 | 45 | | employee may be paid for the hours of compensatory time the employee |
---|
46 | 46 | | earns for work directly related to a disaster or emergency declared |
---|
47 | 47 | | by the appropriate officer of the state or federal government. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (j) With authorization from the administrative head of the |
---|
49 | 49 | | agency for which an employee works, or that person's designee, an |
---|
50 | 50 | | employee employed by a state mental health or mental retardation |
---|
51 | 51 | | facility may be paid for any unused compensatory time if the |
---|
52 | 52 | | employing agency determines that taking the compensatory time off |
---|
53 | 53 | | would disrupt the normal business functions of the agency. |
---|
54 | 54 | | SECTION 5. Section 659.016, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
55 | 55 | | amending Subsection (i) and adding Subsection (j) to read as |
---|
56 | 56 | | follows: |
---|
57 | 57 | | (i) Except as provided by this subsection and Subsection |
---|
58 | 58 | | (j), an [An] employee covered by this section may not be paid for |
---|
59 | 59 | | any unused compensatory time. With authorization from the |
---|
60 | 60 | | administrative head of the agency for which a state employee works, |
---|
61 | 61 | | or that person's designee, an employee may be paid for the hours of |
---|
62 | 62 | | compensatory time the employee earns for work directly related to a |
---|
63 | 63 | | disaster or emergency declared by the appropriate officer of the |
---|
64 | 64 | | state or federal government. |
---|
65 | 65 | | (j) With authorization from the administrative head of the |
---|
66 | 66 | | agency for which an employee works, or that person's designee, an |
---|
67 | 67 | | employee employed by a state mental health or mental retardation |
---|
68 | 68 | | facility may be paid for any unused compensatory time if the |
---|
69 | 69 | | employing agency determines that taking the compensatory time off |
---|
70 | 70 | | would disrupt the normal business functions of the agency. |
---|
71 | 71 | | SECTION 6. Section 659.018, Government Code, is amended to |
---|
72 | 72 | | read as follows: |
---|
73 | 73 | | Sec. 659.018. COMPENSATORY TIME: PLACE WHERE WORK |
---|
74 | 74 | | PERFORMED. (a) Except under circumstances specified in the |
---|
75 | 75 | | General Appropriations Act or as provided by Subsection (b), an |
---|
76 | 76 | | employee of a state agency as defined by Section 658.001 may not, |
---|
77 | 77 | | for hours worked during any calendar week, accumulate compensatory |
---|
78 | 78 | | time off under Section 659.015(f) or 659.016 to the extent that the |
---|
79 | 79 | | hours are attributable to work performed at a location other than |
---|
80 | 80 | | the employee's regular or temporarily assigned place of employment. |
---|
81 | 81 | | (b) An employee may accumulate compensatory time off for |
---|
82 | 82 | | hours worked during any calendar week at the [The] employee's |
---|
83 | 83 | | personal residence if the employee obtains the advance approval of |
---|
84 | 84 | | the administrative head of the agency for which the employee works |
---|
85 | 85 | | or that person's designee [may not be considered the employee's |
---|
86 | 86 | | regular or temporarily assigned place of employment]. |
---|
87 | 87 | | SECTION 7. Section 659.255, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
88 | 88 | | adding Subsection (g) to read as follows: |
---|
89 | 89 | | (g) The six-month limitations prescribed by Subsections |
---|
90 | 90 | | (f)(2) and (5) do not apply if the administrative head of the agency |
---|
91 | 91 | | determines in writing that the merit payment is made in relation to |
---|
92 | 92 | | the employee's performance during a natural disaster or other |
---|
93 | 93 | | extraordinary circumstance. |
---|
94 | 94 | | SECTION 8. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
95 | 95 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
96 | 96 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
97 | 97 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
98 | 98 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
99 | 99 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
100 | 100 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
101 | 101 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2298 passed the Senate on |
---|
102 | 102 | | April 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
103 | 103 | | May 15, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
104 | 104 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 20, 2009, House |
---|
105 | 105 | | granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
106 | 106 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
107 | 107 | | Nays 0. |
---|
108 | 108 | | ______________________________ |
---|
109 | 109 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
110 | 110 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2298 passed the House, with |
---|
111 | 111 | | amendments, on May 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, |
---|
112 | 112 | | Nays 0, two present not voting; May 20, 2009, House granted request |
---|
113 | 113 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
114 | 114 | | May 27, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
115 | 115 | | following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
116 | 116 | | ______________________________ |
---|
117 | 117 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
118 | 118 | | Approved: |
---|
119 | 119 | | ______________________________ |
---|
120 | 120 | | Date |
---|
121 | 121 | | ______________________________ |
---|
122 | 122 | | Governor |
---|