Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2298 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2298


 AN ACT
 relating to compensation of certain state employees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 51.962, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  This subsection applies to an employee employed by the
 institution of higher education for more than six months. The
 requirement that six months elapse between merit salary increases
 prescribed by Subsection (e) does not apply to a one-time merit
 payment if the chief administrative officer of the institution of
 higher education determines in writing that the one-time merit
 payment is made in relation to the employee's performance during a
 natural disaster or other extraordinary circumstance.
 SECTION 2. The heading to Section 659.0125, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 659.0125. SALARY FOR DISTRICT JUDGE OR RETIRED JUDGE
 PRESIDING OVER MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION.
 SECTION 3. Section 659.0125, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A retired judge appointed to an MDL pretrial court, as
 defined by Section 90.001, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, is
 entitled to receive the same compensation and benefits to which a
 district judge is entitled.
 SECTION 4. Section 659.015, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (g) and adding Subsections (i) and (j) to read
 as follows:
 (g) Compensatory time off to which an employee is entitled
 under Subsection (f) must be taken during the 12-month period
 following the end of the workweek in which the compensatory time was
 accrued or it lapses. An employee may not be paid for that
 compensatory time, except as provided by this subsection and
 Subsections (i) and (j). An [However, an] employee of an
 institution of higher education as defined by Section 61.003,
 Education Code, or an employee engaged in a public safety activity,
 including highway construction and maintenance or an emergency
 response activity, may be paid at the employee's regular rate of pay
 for that compensatory time if the employer determines that taking
 the compensatory time off would disrupt normal teaching, research,
 or other critical functions.
 (i)  With authorization from the administrative head of the
 agency for which an employee works, or that person's designee, an
 employee may be paid for the hours of compensatory time the employee
 earns for work directly related to a disaster or emergency declared
 by the appropriate officer of the state or federal government.
 (j)  With authorization from the administrative head of the
 agency for which an employee works, or that person's designee, an
 employee employed by a state mental health or mental retardation
 facility may be paid for any unused compensatory time if the
 employing agency determines that taking the compensatory time off
 would disrupt the normal business functions of the agency.
 SECTION 5. Section 659.016, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (i) and adding Subsection (j) to read as
 follows:
 (i) Except as provided by this subsection and Subsection
 (j), an [An] employee covered by this section may not be paid for
 any unused compensatory time. With authorization from the
 administrative head of the agency for which a state employee works,
 or that person's designee, an employee may be paid for the hours of
 compensatory time the employee earns for work directly related to a
 disaster or emergency declared by the appropriate officer of the
 state or federal government.
 (j)  With authorization from the administrative head of the
 agency for which an employee works, or that person's designee, an
 employee employed by a state mental health or mental retardation
 facility may be paid for any unused compensatory time if the
 employing agency determines that taking the compensatory time off
 would disrupt the normal business functions of the agency.
 SECTION 6. Section 659.018, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 659.018. COMPENSATORY TIME: PLACE WHERE WORK
 PERFORMED. (a) Except under circumstances specified in the
 General Appropriations Act or as provided by Subsection (b), an
 employee of a state agency as defined by Section 658.001 may not,
 for hours worked during any calendar week, accumulate compensatory
 time off under Section 659.015(f) or 659.016 to the extent that the
 hours are attributable to work performed at a location other than
 the employee's regular or temporarily assigned place of employment.
 (b)  An employee may accumulate compensatory time off for
 hours worked during any calendar week at the [The] employee's
 personal residence if the employee obtains the advance approval of
 the administrative head of the agency for which the employee works
 or that person's designee [may not be considered the employee's
 regular or temporarily assigned place of employment].
 SECTION 7. Section 659.255, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  The six-month limitations prescribed by Subsections
 (f)(2) and (5) do not apply if the administrative head of the agency
 determines in writing that the merit payment is made in relation to
 the employee's performance during a natural disaster or other
 extraordinary circumstance.
 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2298 passed the Senate on
 April 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 20, 2009, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2298 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 20, 2009, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 27, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor