1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 2306 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to rates and methods of depreciation applied to a retired |
---|
6 | 6 | | class of property for regulated water utilities. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subsection (c), Section 13.131, Water Code, is |
---|
9 | 9 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | (c) The commission shall fix proper and adequate rates and |
---|
11 | 11 | | methods of depreciation, amortization, or depletion of the several |
---|
12 | 12 | | classes of property of each utility and shall require every utility |
---|
13 | 13 | | to carry a proper and adequate depreciation account in accordance |
---|
14 | 14 | | with those rates and methods and with any other rules the commission |
---|
15 | 15 | | prescribes. Rules adopted under this subsection must require the |
---|
16 | 16 | | book cost less net salvage of depreciable utility plant retired to |
---|
17 | 17 | | be charged in its entirety to the accumulated depreciation account |
---|
18 | 18 | | in a manner consistent with accounting treatment of regulated |
---|
19 | 19 | | electric and gas utilities in this state. Those rates, methods, |
---|
20 | 20 | | and accounts shall be utilized uniformly and consistently |
---|
21 | 21 | | throughout the rate-setting and appeal proceedings. |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
23 | 23 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
24 | 24 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
25 | 25 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
26 | 26 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
27 | 27 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
28 | 28 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
29 | 29 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2306 passed the Senate on |
---|
30 | 30 | | April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; |
---|
31 | 31 | | May 14, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
32 | 32 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 18, 2009, House |
---|
33 | 33 | | granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
34 | 34 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
35 | 35 | | Nays 0. |
---|
36 | 36 | | ______________________________ |
---|
37 | 37 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
38 | 38 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2306 passed the House, with |
---|
39 | 39 | | amendments, on May 11, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, |
---|
40 | 40 | | Nays 1, two present not voting; May 18, 2009, House granted request |
---|
41 | 41 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
42 | 42 | | May 23, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
43 | 43 | | following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, two present not voting. |
---|
44 | 44 | | ______________________________ |
---|
45 | 45 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
46 | 46 | | Approved: |
---|
47 | 47 | | ______________________________ |
---|
48 | 48 | | Date |
---|
49 | 49 | | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | 50 | | Governor |
---|