Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2306 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2306


 AN ACT
 relating to rates and methods of depreciation applied to a retired
 class of property for regulated water utilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (c), Section 13.131, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c) The commission shall fix proper and adequate rates and
 methods of depreciation, amortization, or depletion of the several
 classes of property of each utility and shall require every utility
 to carry a proper and adequate depreciation account in accordance
 with those rates and methods and with any other rules the commission
 prescribes. Rules adopted under this subsection must require the
 book cost less net salvage of depreciable utility plant retired to
 be charged in its entirety to the accumulated depreciation account
 in a manner consistent with accounting treatment of regulated
 electric and gas utilities in this state. Those rates, methods,
 and accounts shall be utilized uniformly and consistently
 throughout the rate-setting and appeal proceedings.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2306 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0;
 May 14, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 18, 2009, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2306 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 11, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 1, two present not voting; May 18, 2009, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 23, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor