1 | 1 | | 81R12246 UM-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Ellis S.B. No. 2360 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to reducing state school commitments and increasing |
---|
8 | 8 | | community services for persons with mental retardation. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 533.0355(b), Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
11 | 11 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (b) In adopting rules under this section, the executive |
---|
13 | 13 | | commissioner must include rules regarding the following local |
---|
14 | 14 | | mental retardation authority responsibilities: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (1) access; |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) intake; |
---|
17 | 17 | | (3) eligibility functions; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (4) enrollment, initial person-centered assessment, |
---|
19 | 19 | | and service authorization; |
---|
20 | 20 | | (5) case management services for individuals |
---|
21 | 21 | | receiving services under a Home and Community-based Services (HCS) |
---|
22 | 22 | | waiver program; |
---|
23 | 23 | | (6) utilization management; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (7) [(6)] safety net functions, including crisis |
---|
25 | 25 | | management services and assistance in accessing facility-based |
---|
26 | 26 | | care; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (8) [(7)] service coordination functions; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (9) [(8)] provision and oversight of state general |
---|
29 | 29 | | revenue services; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (10) [(9)] local planning functions, including |
---|
31 | 31 | | stakeholder involvement, technical assistance and training, and |
---|
32 | 32 | | provider complaint and resolution processes; and |
---|
33 | 33 | | (11) [(10)] processes to assure accountability in |
---|
34 | 34 | | performance, compliance, and monitoring. |
---|
35 | 35 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 553, Health and Safety |
---|
36 | 36 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 553.002 to read as follows: |
---|
37 | 37 | | Sec. 553.002. STATE SCHOOL CENSUS REQUIREMENTS. (a) In this |
---|
38 | 38 | | section: |
---|
39 | 39 | | (1) "Alleged offender resident" means a resident who: |
---|
40 | 40 | | (A) was committed to or transferred to a state |
---|
41 | 41 | | school under Chapter 46B or 46C, Code of Criminal Procedure, as a |
---|
42 | 42 | | result of being charged with or convicted of a criminal offense; or |
---|
43 | 43 | | (B) is a child committed to or transferred to a |
---|
44 | 44 | | state school under Chapter 55, Family Code, as a result of being |
---|
45 | 45 | | alleged by petition or having been found to have engaged in |
---|
46 | 46 | | delinquent conduct constituting a criminal offense. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (2) "Department" means the Department of Aging and |
---|
48 | 48 | | Disability Services. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (3) "Resident" means a person with mental retardation |
---|
50 | 50 | | who resides in a state school or the ICF-MR component of the Rio |
---|
51 | 51 | | Grande State Center. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (b) On or before September 1, 2013, the total census of |
---|
53 | 53 | | residents in state schools and the ICF-MR component of the Rio |
---|
54 | 54 | | Grande State Center may not exceed 3,000 residents, excluding |
---|
55 | 55 | | alleged offender residents, and the census of each state school may |
---|
56 | 56 | | not exceed 350 residents, excluding alleged offender residents. |
---|
57 | 57 | | (c) To achieve the census requirement under Subsection (b), |
---|
58 | 58 | | the department shall: |
---|
59 | 59 | | (1) reduce the total state school census by at least |
---|
60 | 60 | | 500 residents on or before September 1, 2011; and |
---|
61 | 61 | | (2) identify at least 1,500 residents who can |
---|
62 | 62 | | transition to receiving services in the community through a Section |
---|
63 | 63 | | 1915(c) waiver program and transition those residents not later |
---|
64 | 64 | | than September 1, 2013. |
---|
65 | 65 | | SECTION 3. (a) The Health and Human Services Commission and |
---|
66 | 66 | | the Department of Aging and Disability Services shall jointly |
---|
67 | 67 | | conduct a study regarding the feasibility of providing medical |
---|
68 | 68 | | assistance for long-term services and supports through the Medicaid |
---|
69 | 69 | | managed care program under Chapter 533, Government Code, to persons |
---|
70 | 70 | | with mental retardation who are eligible for that assistance. |
---|
71 | 71 | | (b) Not later than December 1, 2010, the Health and Human |
---|
72 | 72 | | Services Commission and the Department of Aging and Disability |
---|
73 | 73 | | Services shall submit a report regarding the results of the study to |
---|
74 | 74 | | the governor, the Legislative Budget Board, the lieutenant |
---|
75 | 75 | | governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, the Senate |
---|
76 | 76 | | Finance Committee, the Senate Health and Human Services Committee, |
---|
77 | 77 | | the House Appropriations Committee, and the House Human Services |
---|
78 | 78 | | Committee. The report must include: |
---|
79 | 79 | | (1) a cost-benefit analysis of providing medical |
---|
80 | 80 | | assistance to persons with mental retardation in the manner |
---|
81 | 81 | | described by Subsection (a) of this section; |
---|
82 | 82 | | (2) a proposal for the implementation of the provision |
---|
83 | 83 | | of that medical assistance if implementation is feasible; and |
---|
84 | 84 | | (3) a description of any legislative action necessary |
---|
85 | 85 | | to provide that medical assistance if implementation is feasible. |
---|
86 | 86 | | SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2010, the executive |
---|
87 | 87 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
88 | 88 | | adopt rules relating to the provision of case management services |
---|
89 | 89 | | for individuals receiving services under a Home and Community-based |
---|
90 | 90 | | Services (HCS) waiver and shall ensure that this function is |
---|
91 | 91 | | transferred to local mental retardation authorities as quickly as |
---|
92 | 92 | | possible without disrupting the provision of services. |
---|
93 | 93 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|