Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2360 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R12246 UM-D
 By: Ellis S.B. No. 2360


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reducing state school commitments and increasing
 community services for persons with mental retardation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 533.0355(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) In adopting rules under this section, the executive
 commissioner must include rules regarding the following local
 mental retardation authority responsibilities:
 (1) access;
 (2) intake;
 (3) eligibility functions;
 (4) enrollment, initial person-centered assessment,
 and service authorization;
 (5) case management services for individuals
 receiving services under a Home and Community-based Services (HCS)
 waiver program;
 (6) utilization management;
 (7) [(6)] safety net functions, including crisis
 management services and assistance in accessing facility-based
 care;
 (8) [(7)] service coordination functions;
 (9) [(8)] provision and oversight of state general
 revenue services;
 (10) [(9)] local planning functions, including
 stakeholder involvement, technical assistance and training, and
 provider complaint and resolution processes; and
 (11) [(10)] processes to assure accountability in
 performance, compliance, and monitoring.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 553, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 553.002 to read as follows:
 Sec. 553.002.  STATE SCHOOL CENSUS REQUIREMENTS. (a) In this
 section:
 (1) "Alleged offender resident" means a resident who:
 (A)  was committed to or transferred to a state
 school under Chapter 46B or 46C, Code of Criminal Procedure, as a
 result of being charged with or convicted of a criminal offense; or
 (B)  is a child committed to or transferred to a
 state school under Chapter 55, Family Code, as a result of being
 alleged by petition or having been found to have engaged in
 delinquent conduct constituting a criminal offense.
 (2)  "Department" means the Department of Aging and
 Disability Services.
 (3)  "Resident" means a person with mental retardation
 who resides in a state school or the ICF-MR component of the Rio
 Grande State Center.
 (b)  On or before September 1, 2013, the total census of
 residents in state schools and the ICF-MR component of the Rio
 Grande State Center may not exceed 3,000 residents, excluding
 alleged offender residents, and the census of each state school may
 not exceed 350 residents, excluding alleged offender residents.
 (c)  To achieve the census requirement under Subsection (b),
 the department shall:
 (1)  reduce the total state school census by at least
 500 residents on or before September 1, 2011; and
 (2)  identify at least 1,500 residents who can
 transition to receiving services in the community through a Section
 1915(c) waiver program and transition those residents not later
 than September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 3. (a) The Health and Human Services Commission and
 the Department of Aging and Disability Services shall jointly
 conduct a study regarding the feasibility of providing medical
 assistance for long-term services and supports through the Medicaid
 managed care program under Chapter 533, Government Code, to persons
 with mental retardation who are eligible for that assistance.
 (b) Not later than December 1, 2010, the Health and Human
 Services Commission and the Department of Aging and Disability
 Services shall submit a report regarding the results of the study to
 the governor, the Legislative Budget Board, the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, the Senate
 Finance Committee, the Senate Health and Human Services Committee,
 the House Appropriations Committee, and the House Human Services
 Committee. The report must include:
 (1) a cost-benefit analysis of providing medical
 assistance to persons with mental retardation in the manner
 described by Subsection (a) of this section;
 (2) a proposal for the implementation of the provision
 of that medical assistance if implementation is feasible; and
 (3) a description of any legislative action necessary
 to provide that medical assistance if implementation is feasible.
 SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2010, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt rules relating to the provision of case management services
 for individuals receiving services under a Home and Community-based
 Services (HCS) waiver and shall ensure that this function is
 transferred to local mental retardation authorities as quickly as
 possible without disrupting the provision of services.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.