Senate | 04/30/2009 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1777 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1226 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |