Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB24 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 24
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2008; February 10, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 20, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 20, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 24 By: Wentworth


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the waiting period for issuing a decree in certain suits
 for divorce.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 6.702, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (c), the [The] court
 may not grant a divorce before the 60th day after the date the suit
 was filed. A decree rendered in violation of this subsection is not
 subject to collateral attack.
 (c)  A waiting period is not required under Subsection (a)
 before a court may grant a divorce in a suit in which the court finds
 that:
 (1)  the respondent has been finally convicted of or
 received deferred adjudication for an offense involving family
 violence as defined by Section 71.004 against the petitioner or a
 member of the petitioner's household; or
 (2)  the petitioner has obtained a protective order
 under Title 4 or a magistrate's order for emergency protection
 under Article 17.292, Code of Criminal Procedure, against the
 respondent because of family violence committed during the
 marriage.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a suit for dissolution of a marriage filed on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A suit for dissolution of a marriage
 filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect on the date the suit was filed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *