Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2437 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Uresti S.B. No. 2437
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 20, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 20, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use by a metropolitan rapid transit authority of the
 construction manager-at-risk method for the construction,
 rehabilitation, alteration, or repair of a facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a-1), Section 271.118, Local
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a-1) In this section:
 (1) "Facility" ["facility"] means an improvement to
 real property.
 (2)  "Governmental entity" includes a metropolitan
 rapid transit authority under Chapter 451, Transportation Code.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *