E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4975
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5982
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4324
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4324
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4324
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4324
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1367
|
Journal Page: 4987
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4987
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Rios Ybarra
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4646
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4646
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4646
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4638
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4286
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3953
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2215
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1775
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1775
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1775
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1775
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1775
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1775
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1775
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1107
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 995
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 818
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 818
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|