Senate | 05/05/2009 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 2003 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 819 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 819 | |
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |