1 | 1 | | By: Wentworth S.B. No. 2471 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 26, 2009; March 31, 2009, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, |
---|
5 | 5 | | Nays 0; April 22, 2009, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to certain exemptions from ad valorem taxes imposed by the |
---|
11 | 11 | | Cow Creek Groundwater Conservation District. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Subsections (f) and (h), Section 3.0111, Chapter |
---|
14 | 14 | | 966, Acts of the 77th Legislature, Regular Session, 2001, are |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (f) The district may adopt rules providing for granting |
---|
17 | 17 | | exemptions [shall grant an exemption or other relief] from ad |
---|
18 | 18 | | valorem taxes on property on which a water conservation initiative |
---|
19 | 19 | | has been implemented as provided by Section 11.32, Tax Code. [The |
---|
20 | 20 | | district shall adopt rules to implement this subsection. A retail |
---|
21 | 21 | | public utility shall receive the same exemption or relief from ad |
---|
22 | 22 | | valorem taxes on property as any other customer of the district |
---|
23 | 23 | | would receive.] |
---|
24 | 24 | | (h) The total amount of the exemption [or other relief] from |
---|
25 | 25 | | ad valorem taxes may not exceed one-half of the tax imposed [levied] |
---|
26 | 26 | | by the district. |
---|
27 | 27 | | SECTION 2. Subsections (f) and (i), Section 11, Chapter |
---|
28 | 28 | | 1349, Acts of the 77th Legislature, Regular Session, 2001, are |
---|
29 | 29 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (f) The district may [shall] adopt rules providing for |
---|
31 | 31 | | granting exemptions from ad valorem taxes on property on which a |
---|
32 | 32 | | water conservation initiative has been implemented as provided by |
---|
33 | 33 | | [. The rules adopted by the district must be consistent with the |
---|
34 | 34 | | rules adopted by the comptroller to implement] Section 11.32, Tax |
---|
35 | 35 | | Code. |
---|
36 | 36 | | (i) The total amount of the exemption from ad valorem taxes |
---|
37 | 37 | | may [shall] not exceed one-half of the tax imposed by the district. |
---|
38 | 38 | | SECTION 3. The following laws are repealed: |
---|
39 | 39 | | (1) Subsection (g), Section 3.0111, Chapter 966, Acts |
---|
40 | 40 | | of the 77th Legislature, Regular Session, 2001; and |
---|
41 | 41 | | (2) Subsections (g) and (h), Section 11, Chapter 1349, |
---|
42 | 42 | | Acts of the 77th Legislature, Regular Session, 2001. |
---|
43 | 43 | | SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to |
---|
44 | 44 | | ad valorem taxes imposed by the Cow Creek Groundwater Conservation |
---|
45 | 45 | | District for a tax year beginning on or after January 1, 2010. |
---|
46 | 46 | | SECTION 5. (a) The legal notice of the intention to |
---|
47 | 47 | | introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this |
---|
48 | 48 | | Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a |
---|
49 | 49 | | copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies, |
---|
50 | 50 | | officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished |
---|
51 | 51 | | under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313, |
---|
52 | 52 | | Government Code. |
---|
53 | 53 | | (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has |
---|
54 | 54 | | submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on |
---|
55 | 55 | | Environmental Quality. |
---|
56 | 56 | | (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed |
---|
57 | 57 | | its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the |
---|
58 | 58 | | lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of |
---|
59 | 59 | | representatives within the required time. |
---|
60 | 60 | | (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this |
---|
61 | 61 | | state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect |
---|
62 | 62 | | to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled |
---|
63 | 63 | | and accomplished. |
---|
64 | 64 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
65 | 65 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
66 | 66 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
67 | 67 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
68 | 68 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
69 | 69 | | * * * * * |
---|