House | 05/19/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3939 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1595 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1595 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1568 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1131 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1131 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1131 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1130 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1130 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1130 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1130 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 221 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 221 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |