E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5157 | |
E | 05/28/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4208 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5197 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3911 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4093 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3192 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Record vote | RV#1164 | Journal Page: 4779 |
House | 05/25/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 4779 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4779 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4324 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4324 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB4734 | Journal Page: 4324 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3679 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2296 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2296 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1926 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1661 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1445 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1445 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1445 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1444 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1444 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1444 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1444 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1010 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 926 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 926 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |