E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6901
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5008
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5008
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1076
|
Journal Page: 5007
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4996
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6112
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4829
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5819
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5819
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5981
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5981
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5981
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4206
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2537
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#954
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3975
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3969
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Dunnam
|
Journal Page: 3969
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3969
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1353
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|