Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2513 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 2513
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the name and confirmation of, and to certain fees
66 imposed by, the McLennan County Groundwater Conservation District
77 and to the authority to create certain adjacent groundwater
88 conservation districts.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. The heading to Chapter 8821, Special District
1111 Local Laws Code, is amended to read as follows:
1212 CHAPTER 8821. SOUTHERN TRINITY [MCLENNAN COUNTY]
1313 GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
1414 SECTION 2. Subdivision (3), Section 8821.001, Special
1515 District Local Laws Code, is amended to read as follows:
1616 (3) "District" means the Southern Trinity [McLennan
1717 County] Groundwater Conservation District.
1818 SECTION 3. Section 8821.002, Special District Local Laws
1919 Code, is amended to read as follows:
2020 Sec. 8821.002. NATURE OF DISTRICT. The district is a
2121 groundwater conservation district in McLennan County created under
2222 and essential to accomplish the purposes of Section 59, Article
2323 XVI, Texas Constitution. The district is located in a priority
2424 groundwater management area designated by the Texas Commission on
2525 Environmental Quality pursuant to Section 35.008, Water Code.
2626 SECTION 4. Section 8821.024, Special District Local Laws
2727 Code, is amended to read as follows:
2828 Sec. 8821.024. INITIAL DIRECTORS. (a) The [If creation of
2929 the district is confirmed at an election held under Section
3030 8821.023, the] temporary directors are [become] the initial
3131 directors and serve for the terms provided by Subsection (b).
3232 (b) The initial directors representing commissioners
3333 precincts 2 and 4 serve a term expiring on December 31, 2011
3434 [following the expiration of two years after the date of the
3535 confirmation election], and the initial directors representing
3636 commissioners precincts 1 and 3 and the at-large director serve a
3737 term expiring on December 31, 2013 [following the expiration of
3838 four years after the date of the confirmation election].
3939 SECTION 5. Section 8821.025, Special District Local Laws
4040 Code, is amended to read as follows:
4141 Sec. 8821.025. EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
4242 expires December 31, 2013 [September 1, 2012].
4343 SECTION 6. Section 8821.152, Special District Local Laws
4444 Code, is amended to read as follows:
4545 Sec. 8821.152. DISTRICT REVENUES. (a) The district by
4646 rule, resolution, or order may establish, amend, pledge, encumber,
4747 expend the proceeds from, and assess to any person fees for services
4848 or production fees based on the amount of groundwater authorized by
4949 permit to be withdrawn from a well, or on the amount of water
5050 actually withdrawn, to enable the district to fulfill its purposes
5151 and regulatory functions as provided by this chapter. The district
5252 may use revenues generated by fees it assesses for any lawful
5353 purpose.
5454 (b) Notwithstanding any provision of general law to the
5555 contrary, a fee authorized by Subsection (a) may not exceed:
5656 (1) $1 per acre-foot annually for groundwater used for
5757 agricultural purposes; or
5858 (2) 30 cents per thousand gallons annually for
5959 groundwater used for nonagricultural purposes.
6060 (c) Notwithstanding any provision of general law or this
6161 chapter to the contrary, if any, the district may assess a
6262 production fee under this section for groundwater produced from a
6363 well or class of wells exempt from permitting under Section 36.117,
6464 Water Code, except for a well exempt from permitting under Section
6565 36.117(b)(1), Water Code. A production fee assessed by the
6666 district under this subsection must be based on the amount of
6767 groundwater actually withdrawn from the well and may not exceed the
6868 amount established by the district for permitted uses under
6969 Subsection (b)(2) of this section [FEES. The district may impose a
7070 user fee to pay for the creation and operation of the district,
7171 including permit hearings. The district may not impose a fee for
7272 agricultural use that is more than 20 percent of the rate for
7373 municipal use].
7474 SECTION 7. The following provisions of the Special District
7575 Local Laws Code are repealed:
7676 (1) Subsection (c), Section 8821.021; and
7777 (2) Sections 8821.003 and 8821.023.
7878 SECTION 8. Notwithstanding Sections 35.012 and 36.0151,
7979 Water Code, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall
8080 not, before September 1, 2011, create a groundwater conservation
8181 district:
8282 (1) in the priority groundwater management area in
8383 which the Southern Trinity Groundwater Conservation District is
8484 located; or
8585 (2) in a priority groundwater management area that is
8686 adjacent to the priority groundwater management area in which the
8787 Southern Trinity Groundwater Conservation District is located.
8888 SECTION 9. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
8989 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
9090 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
9191 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
9292 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
9393 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
9494 Government Code.
9595 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
9696 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
9797 Environmental Quality.
9898 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
9999 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
100100 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
101101 representatives within the required time.
102102 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
103103 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
104104 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
105105 and accomplished.
106106 SECTION 10. This Act takes effect immediately if it
107107 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
108108 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
109109 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate
110110 effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
111111 ______________________________ ______________________________
112112 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
113113 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2513 passed the Senate on
114114 April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0;
115115 May 28, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and
116116 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House
117117 granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted
118118 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
119119 Nays 0.
120120 ______________________________
121121 Secretary of the Senate
122122 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2513 passed the House, with
123123 amendment, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
124124 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted request
125125 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
126126 May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
127127 following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, one present not voting.
128128 ______________________________
129129 Chief Clerk of the House
130130 Approved:
131131 ______________________________
132132 Date
133133 ______________________________
134134 Governor