Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2519 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2519


 AN ACT
 relating to the Clear Creek Watershed Authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 2a, Chapter 372, Acts of the 56th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1959, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 2a. Notwithstanding the provisions of Section 2 of
 this Act, the Authority does not include within its boundaries any
 territory that is located within the incorporated limits of any
 municipality, as those incorporated limits existed on January 1,
 2009 [city].
 SECTION 2. Section 9006.004, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Territory in the authority that is annexed by a
 municipality on or after January 1, 2009, remains in the authority.
 SECTION 3. Section 9006.207, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 9006.207. AUTHORITY PROPERTY NOT SUBJECT TO TAXATION.
 Property owned by the [The] authority is exempt from [liable for] ad
 valorem taxes imposed by a county, municipality, [or] school
 district, or other entity [on property owned by the authority].
 SECTION 4. (a) All governmental acts and proceedings of
 the Clear Creek Watershed Authority that were taken before the
 effective date of this Act are validated, ratified, and confirmed
 in all respects as if they had been taken as authorized by law.
 (b) This section does not apply to any matter that on the
 effective date of this Act:
 (1) is involved in litigation if the litigation
 ultimately results in the matter being held invalid by a final court
 judgment; or
 (2) has been held invalid by a final court judgment.
 SECTION 5. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2519 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2519 passed the House on
 May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 4, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor