Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2534 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 2534
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the creation of an interagency task force on economic
66 growth and endangered species; providing information and direction
77 regarding endangered species issues in certain areas of the state.
88 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
99 SECTION 1. Subtitle F, Title 4, Government Code, is amended
1010 by adding Chapter 490E to read as follows:
1111 CHAPTER 490E. TASK FORCE ON ECONOMIC GROWTH AND ENDANGERED SPECIES
1212 Sec. 490E.001. PURPOSE. The purpose of this chapter is to
1313 establish a mechanism for state agencies to provide policy and
1414 technical assistance regarding compliance with endangered species
1515 laws and regulations to local and regional governmental entities
1616 and their communities engaged in economic development activities so
1717 that compliance with endangered species laws and regulations is as
1818 effective and cost efficient as possible.
1919 Sec. 490E.002. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
2020 (1) "Endangered species" has the meaning assigned by
2121 Section 68.002, Parks and Wildlife Code.
2222 (2) "Task force" means the interagency task force on
2323 economic growth and endangered species created under this chapter.
2424 Sec. 490E.003. CREATION. (a) The task force on economic
2525 growth and endangered species is created and is composed of:
2626 (1) the comptroller;
2727 (2) the commissioner of agriculture;
2828 (3) the executive director of the Parks and Wildlife
2929 Department;
3030 (4) the executive director of the Texas Department of
3131 Transportation; and
3232 (5) the executive director of the State Soil and Water
3333 Conservation Board.
3434 (b) The comptroller is the presiding officer of the task
3535 force.
3636 (c) The task force shall meet as often as necessary to
3737 fulfill its duties under this chapter.
3838 (d) New members may be added to the task force by the
3939 unanimous consent of the existing members.
4040 (e) A member of the task force may designate another person
4141 to act on the member's behalf.
4242 Sec. 490E.004. FUNCTIONS AND DUTIES. (a) The task force
4343 may:
4444 (1) assess the economic impact on the state of
4545 federal, state, or local regulations relating to endangered
4646 species;
4747 (2) assist landowners and other persons in this state
4848 to identify, evaluate, and implement cost-efficient strategies for
4949 mitigation of impacts to and recovery of endangered species that
5050 will promote economic growth and development in this state; and
5151 (3) facilitate state and local governmental efforts to
5252 effectively implement endangered species regulations in a
5353 cost-efficient manner.
5454 (b) If requested by a local government or a state official,
5555 the task force may review state and local governmental efforts to
5656 address endangered species issues and provide recommendations to
5757 make those efforts more cost effective. The task force shall
5858 consider all available options as part of its recommendations. The
5959 options considered must include:
6060 (1) fee simple acquisition of land;
6161 (2) conservation easements;
6262 (3) use of land owned by local governments or this
6363 state;
6464 (4) recovery crediting; and
6565 (5) all relevant federal programs.
6666 Sec. 490E.005. ADVISORY COMMITTEES. (a) With the advice
6767 of the task force, the comptroller may create advisory committees
6868 to assist the task force with its work. Of the members of an
6969 advisory committee:
7070 (1) one-third must be representatives of affected
7171 landowners;
7272 (2) one-third must be representatives of conservation
7373 interests; and
7474 (3) one-third must be representatives of
7575 municipalities or other affected jurisdictions.
7676 (b) The composition of an advisory committee must provide
7777 the balance necessary to address economic, environmental, and
7878 policy issues related to the specific issue or action under
7979 consideration.
8080 (c) The comptroller shall designate one member of an
8181 advisory committee as interim presiding officer for the purpose of
8282 calling and conducting the initial meeting of the committee.
8383 (d) An advisory committee shall:
8484 (1) at its initial meeting, select a presiding officer
8585 from among its members for the purpose of conducting meetings;
8686 (2) conduct meetings as necessary to perform the
8787 business of the advisory committee; and
8888 (3) provide recommendations to the task force as
8989 requested by the task force.
9090 (e) Chapter 2110 does not apply to the size, composition, or
9191 duration of an advisory committee created under this section.
9292 Sec. 490E.006. COORDINATION WITH OTHER ENTITIES. (a) The
9393 task force shall work in coordination with the United States Fish
9494 and Wildlife Service, institutions of higher education, and
9595 agriculture and conservation organizations in performing its
9696 functions and duties.
9797 (b) The Texas A&M University System shall, within its
9898 expertise:
9999 (1) assist in the analysis of biological and economic
100100 impacts of proposed actions; and
101101 (2) direct programs recommended by the task force.
102102 Sec. 490E.007. REPORTS. The task force may provide reports
103103 as needed on:
104104 (1) innovative programs to address endangered species
105105 issues while promoting economic growth;
106106 (2) the activities of the task force; and
107107 (3) recommendations for future programs or
108108 legislation.
109109 Sec. 490E.008. ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT. The comptroller's
110110 office shall provide administrative support to the task force.
111111 SECTION 2. (a) In this section:
112112 (1) "Endangered Species Act" means the federal
113113 Endangered Species Act of 1973 (16 U.S.C. Section 1531 et seq.).
114114 (2) "Task force" has the meaning assigned by Section
115115 490E.002, Government Code, as added by this Act.
116116 (b) Not later than the 30th day after the effective date of
117117 this Act, the comptroller of public accounts shall create an
118118 advisory committee to assist the task force in identifying
119119 cost-efficient and effective recommendations for economic
120120 development and Endangered Species Act compliance in the Camp
121121 Bullis area in Bexar County.
122122 (c) Not later than October 31, 2009, the task force, with
123123 input from the advisory committee created under Subsection (b) of
124124 this section, shall provide a recommendation on a specific,
125125 coordinated program of work to assist Camp Bullis in accomplishing
126126 its training missions in a manner consistent with applicable
127127 endangered species regulations and programs.
128128 (d) Not later than January 15, 2011, the task force shall
129129 provide a report to the legislature on the activities of the task
130130 force and the status of efforts to mitigate harm to and efforts
131131 toward recovery of endangered species at Camp Bullis.
132132 (e) The advisory committee created under this section is
133133 abolished on the completion of its duties as determined by the task
134134 force.
135135 SECTION 3. This Act does not make an appropriation. A
136136 provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program,
137137 creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental
138138 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
139139 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
140140 provision.
141141 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
142142 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
143143 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
144144 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
145145 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
146146 ______________________________ ______________________________
147147 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
148148 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2534 passed the Senate on
149149 May 7, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
150150 ______________________________
151151 Secretary of the Senate
152152 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2534 passed the House on
153153 May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 2, one
154154 present not voting.
155155 ______________________________
156156 Chief Clerk of the House
157157 Approved:
158158 ______________________________
159159 Date
160160 ______________________________
161161 Governor