Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2534 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2534


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of an interagency task force on economic
 growth and endangered species; providing information and direction
 regarding endangered species issues in certain areas of the state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle F, Title 4, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 490E to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 490E. TASK FORCE ON ECONOMIC GROWTH AND ENDANGERED SPECIES
 Sec. 490E.001.  PURPOSE. The purpose of this chapter is to
 establish a mechanism for state agencies to provide policy and
 technical assistance regarding compliance with endangered species
 laws and regulations to local and regional governmental entities
 and their communities engaged in economic development activities so
 that compliance with endangered species laws and regulations is as
 effective and cost efficient as possible.
 Sec. 490E.002. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Endangered species" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 68.002, Parks and Wildlife Code.
 (2)  "Task force" means the interagency task force on
 economic growth and endangered species created under this chapter.
 Sec. 490E.003.  CREATION. (a)  The task force on economic
 growth and endangered species is created and is composed of:
 (1) the comptroller;
 (2) the commissioner of agriculture;
 (3)  the executive director of the Parks and Wildlife
 Department;
 (4)  the executive director of the Texas Department of
 Transportation; and
 (5)  the executive director of the State Soil and Water
 Conservation Board.
 (b)  The comptroller is the presiding officer of the task
 force.
 (c)  The task force shall meet as often as necessary to
 fulfill its duties under this chapter.
 (d)  New members may be added to the task force by the
 unanimous consent of the existing members.
 (e)  A member of the task force may designate another person
 to act on the member's behalf.
 Sec. 490E.004.  FUNCTIONS AND DUTIES. (a)  The task force
 may:
 (1)  assess the economic impact on the state of
 federal, state, or local regulations relating to endangered
 species;
 (2)  assist landowners and other persons in this state
 to identify, evaluate, and implement cost-efficient strategies for
 mitigation of impacts to and recovery of endangered species that
 will promote economic growth and development in this state; and
 (3)  facilitate state and local governmental efforts to
 effectively implement endangered species regulations in a
 cost-efficient manner.
 (b)  If requested by a local government or a state official,
 the task force may review state and local governmental efforts to
 address endangered species issues and provide recommendations to
 make those efforts more cost effective. The task force shall
 consider all available options as part of its recommendations. The
 options considered must include:
 (1) fee simple acquisition of land;
 (2) conservation easements;
 (3)  use of land owned by local governments or this
 state;
 (4) recovery crediting; and
 (5) all relevant federal programs.
 Sec. 490E.005.  ADVISORY COMMITTEES. (a)  With the advice
 of the task force, the comptroller may create advisory committees
 to assist the task force with its work. Of the members of an
 advisory committee:
 (1)  one-third must be representatives of affected
 landowners;
 (2)  one-third must be representatives of conservation
 interests; and
 (3)  one-third must be representatives of
 municipalities or other affected jurisdictions.
 (b)  The composition of an advisory committee must provide
 the balance necessary to address economic, environmental, and
 policy issues related to the specific issue or action under
 consideration.
 (c)  The comptroller shall designate one member of an
 advisory committee as interim presiding officer for the purpose of
 calling and conducting the initial meeting of the committee.
 (d) An advisory committee shall:
 (1)  at its initial meeting, select a presiding officer
 from among its members for the purpose of conducting meetings;
 (2)  conduct meetings as necessary to perform the
 business of the advisory committee; and
 (3)  provide recommendations to the task force as
 requested by the task force.
 (e)  Chapter 2110 does not apply to the size, composition, or
 duration of an advisory committee created under this section.
 Sec. 490E.006.  COORDINATION WITH OTHER ENTITIES. (a)  The
 task force shall work in coordination with the United States Fish
 and Wildlife Service, institutions of higher education, and
 agriculture and conservation organizations in performing its
 functions and duties.
 (b)  The Texas A&M University System shall, within its
 expertise:
 (1)  assist in the analysis of biological and economic
 impacts of proposed actions; and
 (2) direct programs recommended by the task force.
 Sec. 490E.007.  REPORTS. The task force may provide reports
 as needed on:
 (1)  innovative programs to address endangered species
 issues while promoting economic growth;
 (2) the activities of the task force; and
 (3)  recommendations for future programs or
 legislation.
 Sec. 490E.008.  ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT. The comptroller's
 office shall provide administrative support to the task force.
 SECTION 2. (a) In this section:
 (1) "Endangered Species Act" means the federal
 Endangered Species Act of 1973 (16 U.S.C. Section 1531 et seq.).
 (2) "Task force" has the meaning assigned by Section
 490E.002, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 (b) Not later than the 30th day after the effective date of
 this Act, the comptroller of public accounts shall create an
 advisory committee to assist the task force in identifying
 cost-efficient and effective recommendations for economic
 development and Endangered Species Act compliance in the Camp
 Bullis area in Bexar County.
 (c) Not later than October 31, 2009, the task force, with
 input from the advisory committee created under Subsection (b) of
 this section, shall provide a recommendation on a specific,
 coordinated program of work to assist Camp Bullis in accomplishing
 its training missions in a manner consistent with applicable
 endangered species regulations and programs.
 (d) Not later than January 15, 2011, the task force shall
 provide a report to the legislature on the activities of the task
 force and the status of efforts to mitigate harm to and efforts
 toward recovery of endangered species at Camp Bullis.
 (e) The advisory committee created under this section is
 abolished on the completion of its duties as determined by the task
 force.
 SECTION 3. This Act does not make an appropriation. A
 provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program,
 creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental
 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
 provision.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2534 passed the Senate on
 May 7, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2534 passed the House on
 May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 2, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor