Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2543 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2543


 AN ACT
 relating to the enforcement of rules by the Harris-Galveston
 Subsidence District and the Fort Bend Subsidence District;
 providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsections (a) and (c), Section 8801.204,
 Special District Local Laws Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) If it appears that a person has violated or is violating
 or threatening to violate this chapter or a rule, permit, or other
 order of the district issued or adopted under this chapter, the
 district may institute an action in a district court in the district
 for:
 (1) injunctive relief to restrain the person from
 continuing the violation or threat of violation;
 (2) the assessment and recovery of a civil penalty of:
 (A) not less than $50 and not more than $5,000 for
 each violation and for each day of a continuing violation, if the
 person is not a political subdivision or an agency of a political
 subdivision; or
 (B)  if the person is a political subdivision or
 an agency of a political subdivision, an amount equal to the greater
 of:
 (i)  120 percent of the sum of the fees
 assessed against the person and the amount the person would have
 paid to an alternative water supplier; or
 (ii)  $5,000 for each violation and for each
 day of a continuing violation; or
 (3) both injunctive relief and civil penalties.
 (c) At the request of the board, or the general manager if
 authorized by the board, the attorney general shall institute and
 conduct an action against any person in the name of the district for
 injunctive relief or to recover a civil penalty, or both.
 SECTION 2. Subsections (a) and (b), Section 43, Chapter
 1045, Acts of the 71st Legislature, Regular Session, 1989, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) If a person has violated, is violating, or is
 threatening to violate a provision of this Act or a rule,
 regulation, permit, or other order of the district, the district
 may bring a civil action in a district court within the district
 for:
 (1) an injunction to restrain the person from
 continuing the violation or the threat of violation;
 (2) the assessment and recovery of[, for] a civil
 penalty of:
 (A) not less than $50 nor more than $5,000 for
 each violation and for each day of violation, if the person is not a
 political subdivision or an agency of a political subdivision; or
 (B)  if the person is a political subdivision or
 an agency of a political subdivision, an amount equal to the greater
 of:
 (i)  120 percent of the sum of the fees
 assessed against the person and the amount the person would have
 paid to an alternative water supplier; or
 (ii)  $5,000 for each violation and for each
 day of a continuing violation; or
 (3) [for] both injunctive relief and civil penalty.
 (b) At the request of the board, or the general manager if
 authorized by the board, the attorney general shall institute and
 conduct an [the] action against any person in the name of the
 district for injunctive relief or to recover a civil penalty, or
 both. However, the district in its sole discretion may employ
 attorneys of its choice to institute the action.
 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a violation that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act.
 A violation that occurs before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect at the time the violation occurred,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2543 passed the Senate on
 May 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2543 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor