House | 05/24/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4354 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 3800 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3800 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3440 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2395 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2351 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2351 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2351 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2350 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2350 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA4 Van de Putte | Journal Page: 2350 |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2350 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2350 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2336 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2336 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2049 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1759 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1759 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1759 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |