Senate | 05/22/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2394 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1930 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 1872 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Motion to request permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1872 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |