1 | 1 | | By: Hinojosa, Davis S.B. No. 265 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2008; February 11, 2009, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 17, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 17, 2009, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 265 By: Fraser |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to benefits and protections for certain residential |
---|
13 | 13 | | electric customers. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 39.101, Utilities Code, is amended by |
---|
16 | 16 | | adding Subsections (i), (j), (k), (l), (m), (n), and (o) to read as |
---|
17 | 17 | | follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (i) A retail electric provider, power generation company, |
---|
19 | 19 | | aggregator, or other entity that provides retail electric service |
---|
20 | 20 | | shall waive any initial deposit requirement for a residential |
---|
21 | 21 | | customer who is not delinquent in payment of any electric service |
---|
22 | 22 | | account with that provider and: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (1) is at least 65 years of age; or |
---|
24 | 24 | | (2) has a payment history for electric service in this |
---|
25 | 25 | | state that includes not more than one late payment in the preceding |
---|
26 | 26 | | 12 months. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (j) During the period beginning July 1 and ending September |
---|
28 | 28 | | 30 of each year, a retail electric provider, power generation |
---|
29 | 29 | | company, aggregator, or other entity that provides retail electric |
---|
30 | 30 | | service may not disconnect service or authorize the disconnection |
---|
31 | 31 | | of service to a residential customer who requests and complies with |
---|
32 | 32 | | the terms of a deferred payment plan and who demonstrates to the |
---|
33 | 33 | | provider that the customer is a low-income electric customer, as |
---|
34 | 34 | | defined by Section 39.903(l). |
---|
35 | 35 | | (k) During the period beginning July 1 and ending September |
---|
36 | 36 | | 30 of each year, a retail electric provider, power generation |
---|
37 | 37 | | company, aggregator, or other entity that provides retail electric |
---|
38 | 38 | | service may not disconnect service or authorize the disconnection |
---|
39 | 39 | | of service to a residential customer who: |
---|
40 | 40 | | (1) is designated in accordance with commission rules |
---|
41 | 41 | | as a critical care residential customer for whom an interruption or |
---|
42 | 42 | | suspension of electric service will create a dangerous or |
---|
43 | 43 | | life-threatening condition; or |
---|
44 | 44 | | (2) requests a deferred payment plan and demonstrates |
---|
45 | 45 | | to the provider that the customer qualifies under commission rules |
---|
46 | 46 | | for designation as a critical care residential customer for whom an |
---|
47 | 47 | | interruption or suspension of electric service will create a |
---|
48 | 48 | | dangerous or life-threatening condition. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (l) A retail electric provider, power generation company, |
---|
50 | 50 | | aggregator, or other entity that provides retail electric service |
---|
51 | 51 | | shall provide to each residential customer designated as a critical |
---|
52 | 52 | | care residential customer and each residential customer on a |
---|
53 | 53 | | reduced rate program described by Section 39.903(h) an annual |
---|
54 | 54 | | notice informing the customer of the protections available under |
---|
55 | 55 | | Subsections (j) and (k). The notice must be provided |
---|
56 | 56 | | contemporaneously with the first invoice issued to the customer |
---|
57 | 57 | | after June 30 of each year. The notice may be printed on the |
---|
58 | 58 | | invoice, included as an insert provided with the invoice, or |
---|
59 | 59 | | provided separately in a way reasonably calculated to inform the |
---|
60 | 60 | | customer of the protections available under Subsections (j) and |
---|
61 | 61 | | (k). |
---|
62 | 62 | | (m) A retail electric provider, power generation company, |
---|
63 | 63 | | aggregator, or other entity that provides retail electric service |
---|
64 | 64 | | shall offer to a residential customer described by Subsection (j) |
---|
65 | 65 | | who requests a deferred payment plan a payment plan that allows the |
---|
66 | 66 | | customer to avoid disconnection of service during the period |
---|
67 | 67 | | described by Subsection (j) if the customer: |
---|
68 | 68 | | (1) pays at least 33 percent of the outstanding |
---|
69 | 69 | | balance due; |
---|
70 | 70 | | (2) agrees to pay remaining balances in equal |
---|
71 | 71 | | installments over the next five billing cycles, unless the customer |
---|
72 | 72 | | agrees to a lesser number of installments; and |
---|
73 | 73 | | (3) does not owe an outstanding balance from an |
---|
74 | 74 | | earlier deferred payment plan granted to allow the customer to |
---|
75 | 75 | | avoid disconnection of service during a period described by |
---|
76 | 76 | | Subsection (j). |
---|
77 | 77 | | (n) A retail electric provider, power generation company, |
---|
78 | 78 | | aggregator, or other entity that provides retail electric service, |
---|
79 | 79 | | on request by a residential customer described by Subsection (j) |
---|
80 | 80 | | who is at least 65 years of age or a residential customer described |
---|
81 | 81 | | by Subsection (k)(2), shall offer to the customer a deferred |
---|
82 | 82 | | payment plan that allows the customer to avoid disconnection of |
---|
83 | 83 | | service during the period described by Subsection (j) or (k) |
---|
84 | 84 | | without any payment of the current month's service charges until |
---|
85 | 85 | | after September 30 if the customer agrees to pay: |
---|
86 | 86 | | (1) 25 percent of the deferred charges when the first |
---|
87 | 87 | | bill issued after September 30 is due; and |
---|
88 | 88 | | (2) the remaining balances in equal installments over |
---|
89 | 89 | | the next five billing cycles after the bill issued after September |
---|
90 | 90 | | 30, unless the customer agrees to a lesser number of installments. |
---|
91 | 91 | | (o) Subsections (i)-(n) do not apply to metered electric |
---|
92 | 92 | | service sold to residential customers on a prepaid basis. |
---|
93 | 93 | | SECTION 2. The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall |
---|
94 | 94 | | adopt rules to implement Subsections (i), (j), (k), (l), (m), (n), |
---|
95 | 95 | | and (o), Section 39.101, Utilities Code, as added by this Act, as |
---|
96 | 96 | | quickly as practicable so that customers are provided protections |
---|
97 | 97 | | prescribed by those subsections before September 30, 2009. |
---|
98 | 98 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
99 | 99 | | * * * * * |
---|