Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB265 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa, Davis S.B. No. 265
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 17, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 17, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 265 By: Fraser


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to benefits and protections for certain residential
 electric customers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 39.101, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (i), (j), (k), (l), (m), (n), and (o) to read as
 follows:
 (i)  A retail electric provider, power generation company,
 aggregator, or other entity that provides retail electric service
 shall waive any initial deposit requirement for a residential
 customer who is not delinquent in payment of any electric service
 account with that provider and:
 (1) is at least 65 years of age; or
 (2)  has a payment history for electric service in this
 state that includes not more than one late payment in the preceding
 12 months.
 (j)  During the period beginning July 1 and ending September
 30 of each year, a retail electric provider, power generation
 company, aggregator, or other entity that provides retail electric
 service may not disconnect service or authorize the disconnection
 of service to a residential customer who requests and complies with
 the terms of a deferred payment plan and who demonstrates to the
 provider that the customer is a low-income electric customer, as
 defined by Section 39.903(l).
 (k)  During the period beginning July 1 and ending September
 30 of each year, a retail electric provider, power generation
 company, aggregator, or other entity that provides retail electric
 service may not disconnect service or authorize the disconnection
 of service to a residential customer who:
 (1)  is designated in accordance with commission rules
 as a critical care residential customer for whom an interruption or
 suspension of electric service will create a dangerous or
 life-threatening condition; or
 (2)  requests a deferred payment plan and demonstrates
 to the provider that the customer qualifies under commission rules
 for designation as a critical care residential customer for whom an
 interruption or suspension of electric service will create a
 dangerous or life-threatening condition.
 (l)  A retail electric provider, power generation company,
 aggregator, or other entity that provides retail electric service
 shall provide to each residential customer designated as a critical
 care residential customer and each residential customer on a
 reduced rate program described by Section 39.903(h) an annual
 notice informing the customer of the protections available under
 Subsections (j) and (k). The notice must be provided
 contemporaneously with the first invoice issued to the customer
 after June 30 of each year. The notice may be printed on the
 invoice, included as an insert provided with the invoice, or
 provided separately in a way reasonably calculated to inform the
 customer of the protections available under Subsections (j) and
 (k).
 (m)  A retail electric provider, power generation company,
 aggregator, or other entity that provides retail electric service
 shall offer to a residential customer described by Subsection (j)
 who requests a deferred payment plan a payment plan that allows the
 customer to avoid disconnection of service during the period
 described by Subsection (j) if the customer:
 (1)  pays at least 33 percent of the outstanding
 balance due;
 (2)  agrees to pay remaining balances in equal
 installments over the next five billing cycles, unless the customer
 agrees to a lesser number of installments; and
 (3)  does not owe an outstanding balance from an
 earlier deferred payment plan granted to allow the customer to
 avoid disconnection of service during a period described by
 Subsection (j).
 (n)  A retail electric provider, power generation company,
 aggregator, or other entity that provides retail electric service,
 on request by a residential customer described by Subsection (j)
 who is at least 65 years of age or a residential customer described
 by Subsection (k)(2), shall offer to the customer a deferred
 payment plan that allows the customer to avoid disconnection of
 service during the period described by Subsection (j) or (k)
 without any payment of the current month's service charges until
 after September 30 if the customer agrees to pay:
 (1)  25 percent of the deferred charges when the first
 bill issued after September 30 is due; and
 (2)  the remaining balances in equal installments over
 the next five billing cycles after the bill issued after September
 30, unless the customer agrees to a lesser number of installments.
 (o)  Subsections (i)-(n) do not apply to metered electric
 service sold to residential customers on a prepaid basis.
 SECTION 2. The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall
 adopt rules to implement Subsections (i), (j), (k), (l), (m), (n),
 and (o), Section 39.101, Utilities Code, as added by this Act, as
 quickly as practicable so that customers are provided protections
 prescribed by those subsections before September 30, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *