House | 05/27/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 5123 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4093 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3167 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2511 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 223 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 223 | |
Senate | 11/12/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |