Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB271 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 271
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to informal caregiver support services and to the
66 appointment of a successor guardian for certain wards adjudicated
77 as totally incapacitated.
88 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
99 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 161, Human Resources Code,
1010 is amended by adding Section 161.076 to read as follows:
1111 Sec. 161.076. INFORMAL CAREGIVER SERVICES. (a) In this
1212 section:
1313 (1) "Area agency on aging" has the meaning assigned by
1414 Section 161.075.
1515 (2) "Local entity" means an area agency on aging or
1616 other entity that provides services and support for older or
1717 disabled persons and their caregivers.
1818 (b) The department shall coordinate with area agencies on
1919 aging and, to the extent considered feasible by the department, may
2020 coordinate with other local entities to coordinate public awareness
2121 outreach efforts regarding the role of informal caregivers in
2222 long-term care situations, including efforts to raise awareness of
2323 support services available in this state for informal caregivers.
2424 (c) The department shall perform the following duties to
2525 assist a local entity with outreach efforts under this section:
2626 (1) expand an existing department website to provide a
2727 link through which a local entity may post and access best practices
2828 information regarding informal caregiver support; and
2929 (2) create a document template that a local entity may
3030 adapt as necessary to reflect resources available to informal
3131 caregivers in the area supported by the entity.
3232 (d) The department shall create or modify a form to be
3333 included in the functional eligibility determination process for
3434 long-term care benefits for older persons under the Medicaid
3535 program and, to the extent considered feasible by the department,
3636 may include a form in systems for other long-term care support
3737 services. The department shall use the form to identify informal
3838 caregivers for the purpose of enabling the department to refer the
3939 caregivers to available support services. The form may be based on
4040 an existing form, may include optional questions for an informal
4141 caregiver, or may include questions from similar forms used in
4242 other states.
4343 (e) The department shall coordinate with area agencies on
4444 aging and, to the extent considered feasible by the department, may
4545 coordinate with other local entities to develop and implement a
4646 protocol to evaluate the needs of certain informal caregivers. The
4747 protocol must:
4848 (1) provide guidance on the type of caregivers who
4949 should receive an assessment; and
5050 (2) include the use of a standardized assessment tool
5151 that may be based on similar tools used in other states, including
5252 the Tailored Caregiver Assessment and Referral process.
5353 (f) The department shall require area agencies on aging and,
5454 to the extent considered feasible by the department, other local
5555 entities to use the protocol and assessment tool under Subsection
5656 (e) and report the data gathered from the assessment tool to the
5757 department.
5858 (g) The department shall analyze the data reported under
5959 Subsection (f) and collected from the form under Subsection (d) and
6060 shall submit a report not later than December 1 of each
6161 even-numbered year to the governor and the Legislative Budget Board
6262 that summarizes the data analysis.
6363 (g-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (g), the department shall
6464 submit the initial report required by that subsection not later
6565 than December 1, 2012. This subsection expires January 1, 2013.
6666 (h) The department shall use the data analyzed under
6767 Subsection (g) to:
6868 (1) evaluate the needs of assessed informal
6969 caregivers;
7070 (2) measure the effectiveness of certain informal
7171 caregiver support interventions;
7272 (3) improve existing programs;
7373 (4) develop new services as necessary to sustain
7474 informal caregivers; and
7575 (5) determine the effect of informal caregiving on
7676 employment and employers.
7777 SECTION 2. Section 161.101, Human Resources Code, is
7878 amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (f) to
7979 read as follows:
8080 (d) The department may not be required by a court to file an
8181 application for guardianship, and except as provided by Subsection
8282 (f) and Section 695(c), Texas Probate Code, the department may not
8383 be appointed as permanent guardian for any individual unless the
8484 department files an application to serve or otherwise agrees to
8585 serve as the individual's guardian of the person or estate, or both.
8686 (f) On appointment by a probate court under Section 695(c),
8787 Texas Probate Code, the department shall serve as the successor
8888 guardian of the person or estate, or both, of a ward described by
8989 that section.
9090 SECTION 3. Section 695, Texas Probate Code, is amended by
9191 adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to read as follows:
9292 (c) The court may appoint the Department of Aging and
9393 Disability Services as a successor guardian of the person or
9494 estate, or both, of a ward who has been adjudicated as totally
9595 incapacitated if:
9696 (1) there is no less restrictive alternative to
9797 continuation of the guardianship;
9898 (2) there is no family member or other suitable
9999 person, including a guardianship program, willing and able to serve
100100 as the ward's successor guardian;
101101 (3) the ward is located more than 100 miles from the
102102 court that created the guardianship;
103103 (4) the ward has private assets or access to
104104 government benefits to pay for the needs of the ward;
105105 (5) the department is served with citation and a
106106 hearing is held regarding the department's appointment as proposed
107107 successor guardian; and
108108 (6) the appointment of the department does not violate
109109 a limitation imposed by Subsection (d) of this section.
110110 (d) The number of appointments under Subsection (c) of this
111111 section is subject to an annual limit of 55. The appointments must
112112 be distributed equally or as near as equally as possible among the
113113 health and human services regions of this state. The Department of
114114 Aging and Disability Services at its discretion may establish a
115115 different distribution scheme to promote the efficient use and
116116 administration of resources.
117117 (e) If the Department of Aging and Disability Services is
118118 named as a proposed successor guardian in an application in which
119119 the department is not the applicant, citation must be issued and
120120 served on the department as provided by Section 633(c)(5) of this
121121 code.
122122 SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act
123123 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
124124 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
125125 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
126126 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
127127 waiver or authorization is granted.
128128 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
129129 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
130130 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
131131 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
132132 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
133133 ______________________________ ______________________________
134134 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
135135 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 271 passed the Senate on
136136 March 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
137137 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
138138 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
139139 ______________________________
140140 Secretary of the Senate
141141 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 271 passed the House, with
142142 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
143143 Nays 8, one present not voting.
144144 ______________________________
145145 Chief Clerk of the House
146146 Approved:
147147 ______________________________
148148 Date
149149 ______________________________
150150 Governor