S.B. No. 271 AN ACT relating to informal caregiver support services and to the appointment of a successor guardian for certain wards adjudicated as totally incapacitated. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 161, Human Resources Code, is amended by adding Section 161.076 to read as follows: Sec. 161.076. INFORMAL CAREGIVER SERVICES. (a) In this section: (1) "Area agency on aging" has the meaning assigned by Section 161.075. (2) "Local entity" means an area agency on aging or other entity that provides services and support for older or disabled persons and their caregivers. (b) The department shall coordinate with area agencies on aging and, to the extent considered feasible by the department, may coordinate with other local entities to coordinate public awareness outreach efforts regarding the role of informal caregivers in long-term care situations, including efforts to raise awareness of support services available in this state for informal caregivers. (c) The department shall perform the following duties to assist a local entity with outreach efforts under this section: (1) expand an existing department website to provide a link through which a local entity may post and access best practices information regarding informal caregiver support; and (2) create a document template that a local entity may adapt as necessary to reflect resources available to informal caregivers in the area supported by the entity. (d) The department shall create or modify a form to be included in the functional eligibility determination process for long-term care benefits for older persons under the Medicaid program and, to the extent considered feasible by the department, may include a form in systems for other long-term care support services. The department shall use the form to identify informal caregivers for the purpose of enabling the department to refer the caregivers to available support services. The form may be based on an existing form, may include optional questions for an informal caregiver, or may include questions from similar forms used in other states. (e) The department shall coordinate with area agencies on aging and, to the extent considered feasible by the department, may coordinate with other local entities to develop and implement a protocol to evaluate the needs of certain informal caregivers. The protocol must: (1) provide guidance on the type of caregivers who should receive an assessment; and (2) include the use of a standardized assessment tool that may be based on similar tools used in other states, including the Tailored Caregiver Assessment and Referral process. (f) The department shall require area agencies on aging and, to the extent considered feasible by the department, other local entities to use the protocol and assessment tool under Subsection (e) and report the data gathered from the assessment tool to the department. (g) The department shall analyze the data reported under Subsection (f) and collected from the form under Subsection (d) and shall submit a report not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year to the governor and the Legislative Budget Board that summarizes the data analysis. (g-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (g), the department shall submit the initial report required by that subsection not later than December 1, 2012. This subsection expires January 1, 2013. (h) The department shall use the data analyzed under Subsection (g) to: (1) evaluate the needs of assessed informal caregivers; (2) measure the effectiveness of certain informal caregiver support interventions; (3) improve existing programs; (4) develop new services as necessary to sustain informal caregivers; and (5) determine the effect of informal caregiving on employment and employers. SECTION 2. Section 161.101, Human Resources Code, is amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (f) to read as follows: (d) The department may not be required by a court to file an application for guardianship, and except as provided by Subsection (f) and Section 695(c), Texas Probate Code, the department may not be appointed as permanent guardian for any individual unless the department files an application to serve or otherwise agrees to serve as the individual's guardian of the person or estate, or both. (f) On appointment by a probate court under Section 695(c), Texas Probate Code, the department shall serve as the successor guardian of the person or estate, or both, of a ward described by that section. SECTION 3. Section 695, Texas Probate Code, is amended by adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to read as follows: (c) The court may appoint the Department of Aging and Disability Services as a successor guardian of the person or estate, or both, of a ward who has been adjudicated as totally incapacitated if: (1) there is no less restrictive alternative to continuation of the guardianship; (2) there is no family member or other suitable person, including a guardianship program, willing and able to serve as the ward's successor guardian; (3) the ward is located more than 100 miles from the court that created the guardianship; (4) the ward has private assets or access to government benefits to pay for the needs of the ward; (5) the department is served with citation and a hearing is held regarding the department's appointment as proposed successor guardian; and (6) the appointment of the department does not violate a limitation imposed by Subsection (d) of this section. (d) The number of appointments under Subsection (c) of this section is subject to an annual limit of 55. The appointments must be distributed equally or as near as equally as possible among the health and human services regions of this state. The Department of Aging and Disability Services at its discretion may establish a different distribution scheme to promote the efficient use and administration of resources. (e) If the Department of Aging and Disability Services is named as a proposed successor guardian in an application in which the department is not the applicant, citation must be issued and served on the department as provided by Section 633(c)(5) of this code. SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the waiver or authorization is granted. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 271 passed the Senate on March 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 271 passed the House, with amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 8, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor