E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5156 | |
E | 06/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5155 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6896 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4680 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 5980 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4512 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 4140 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 4140 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 4140 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 4137 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 2571 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Record vote | RV#960 | Journal Page: 3984 |
House | 05/19/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3984 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3984 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 3892 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Amended | 1-Deshotel | Journal Page: 3891 |
House | 05/18/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3891 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2217 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce | Journal Page: 1595 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1595 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1218 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1008 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1008 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1008 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |