Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB28 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 28
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the use of a computer for an unauthorized purpose;
66 providing a civil penalty.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. Section 324.002, Business & Commerce Code, as
99 effective April 1, 2009, is amended by adding Subdivisions (1-a)
1010 and (9) to read as follows:
1111 (1-a) "Botnet" means a collection of two or more
1212 zombies.
1313 (9) "Zombie" means a computer that, without the
1414 knowledge and consent of the computer's owner or operator, has been
1515 compromised to give access or control to a program or person other
1616 than the computer's owner or operator.
1717 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 324.003, Business &
1818 Commerce Code, as effective April 1, 2009, is amended to read as
1919 follows:
2020 (a) Section 324.052, other than Subdivision (1) of that
2121 section, and Sections 324.053(4), [and] 324.054, and 324.055 do not
2222 apply to a telecommunications carrier, cable operator, computer
2323 hardware or software provider, or provider of information service
2424 or interactive computer service that monitors or has interaction
2525 with a subscriber's Internet or other network connection or service
2626 or a protected computer for:
2727 (1) a network or computer security purpose;
2828 (2) diagnostics, technical support, or a repair
2929 purpose;
3030 (3) an authorized update of computer software or
3131 system firmware;
3232 (4) authorized remote system management; or
3333 (5) detection or prevention of unauthorized use of or
3434 fraudulent or other illegal activity in connection with a network,
3535 service, or computer software, including scanning for and removing
3636 software proscribed under this chapter.
3737 SECTION 3. Section 324.005, Business & Commerce Code, as
3838 effective April 1, 2009, is amended to read as follows:
3939 Sec. 324.005. KNOWING VIOLATION. A person knowingly
4040 violates Section 324.051, 324.052, [or] 324.053, or 324.055 if the
4141 person:
4242 (1) acts with actual knowledge of the facts that
4343 constitute the violation; or
4444 (2) consciously avoids information that would
4545 establish actual knowledge of those facts.
4646 SECTION 4. Subchapter B, Chapter 324, Business & Commerce
4747 Code, as effective April 1, 2009, is amended by adding Section
4848 324.055 to read as follows:
4949 Sec. 324.055. UNAUTHORIZED CREATION OF, ACCESS TO, OR USE
5050 OF ZOMBIES OR BOTNETS; PRIVATE ACTION. (a) In this section:
5151 (1) "Internet service provider" means a person
5252 providing connectivity to the Internet or another wide area
5353 network.
5454 (2) "Person" has the meaning assigned by Section
5555 311.005, Government Code.
5656 (b) A person who is not the owner or operator of the computer
5757 may not knowingly cause or offer to cause a computer to become a
5858 zombie or part of a botnet.
5959 (c) A person may not knowingly create, have created, use, or
6060 offer to use a zombie or botnet to:
6161 (1) send an unsolicited commercial electronic mail
6262 message, as defined by Section 321.001;
6363 (2) send a signal to a computer system or network that
6464 causes a loss of service to users;
6565 (3) send data from a computer without authorization by
6666 the owner or operator of the computer;
6767 (4) forward computer software designed to damage or
6868 disrupt another computer or system;
6969 (5) collect personally identifiable information; or
7070 (6) perform an act for another purpose not authorized
7171 by the owner or operator of the computer.
7272 (d) A person may not:
7373 (1) purchase, rent, or otherwise gain control of a
7474 zombie or botnet created by another person; or
7575 (2) sell, lease, offer for sale or lease, or otherwise
7676 provide to another person access to or use of a zombie or botnet.
7777 (e) The following persons may bring a civil action against a
7878 person who violates this section:
7979 (1) a person who is acting as an Internet service
8080 provider and whose network is used to commit a violation under this
8181 section; or
8282 (2) a person who has incurred a loss or disruption of
8383 the conduct of the person's business, including for-profit or
8484 not-for-profit activities, as a result of the violation.
8585 (f) A person bringing an action under this section may, for
8686 each violation:
8787 (1) seek injunctive relief to restrain a violator from
8888 continuing the violation;
8989 (2) subject to Subsection (g), recover damages in an
9090 amount equal to the greater of:
9191 (A) actual damages arising from the violation; or
9292 (B) $100,000 for each zombie used to commit the
9393 violation; or
9494 (3) obtain both injunctive relief and damages.
9595 (g) The court may increase an award of damages, statutory or
9696 otherwise, in an action brought under this section to an amount not
9797 to exceed three times the applicable damages if the court finds that
9898 the violations have occurred with such a frequency as to constitute
9999 a pattern or practice.
100100 (h) A plaintiff who prevails in an action brought under this
101101 section is entitled to recover court costs and reasonable
102102 attorney's fees, reasonable fees of experts, and other reasonable
103103 costs of litigation.
104104 (i) A remedy authorized by this section is not exclusive but
105105 is in addition to any other procedure or remedy provided for by
106106 other statutory or common law.
107107 (j) Nothing in this section may be construed to impose
108108 liability on the following persons with respect to a violation of
109109 this section committed by another person:
110110 (1) an Internet service provider;
111111 (2) a provider of interactive computer service, as
112112 defined by Section 230, Communications Act of 1934 (47 U.S.C.
113113 Section 230);
114114 (3) a telecommunications provider, as defined by
115115 Section 51.002, Utilities Code; or
116116 (4) a video service provider or cable service
117117 provider, as defined by Section 66.002, Utilities Code.
118118 SECTION 5. Subsection (a), Section 324.101, Business &
119119 Commerce Code, as effective April 1, 2009, is amended to read as
120120 follows:
121121 (a) Any of the following persons, if adversely affected by
122122 the violation, may bring a civil action against a person who
123123 violates Section 324.051, 324.052, 324.053, or 324.054 [this
124124 chapter]:
125125 (1) a provider of computer software;
126126 (2) an owner of a web page or trademark;
127127 (3) a telecommunications carrier;
128128 (4) a cable operator; or
129129 (5) an Internet service provider.
130130 SECTION 6. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
131131 conduct that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act.
132132 Conduct that occurs before the effective date of this Act is
133133 governed by the law in effect at the time the conduct occurred, and
134134 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
135135 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
136136 ______________________________ ______________________________
137137 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
138138 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 28 passed the Senate on
139139 April 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
140140 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 28, 2009, by the
141141 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
142142 ______________________________
143143 Secretary of the Senate
144144 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 28 passed the House, with
145145 amendments, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
146146 Nays 0, two present not voting.
147147 ______________________________
148148 Chief Clerk of the House
149149 Approved:
150150 ______________________________
151151 Date
152152 ______________________________
153153 Governor