E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2777
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5982
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2683
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1047
|
Journal Page: 4258
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4258
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4258
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4138
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4138
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 4137
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
3-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 4136
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Castro
|
Journal Page: 4136
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4135
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/20/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3913
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3913
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1265
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1265
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1178
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 924
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 821
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 224
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 224
|
Senate
|
02/03/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 130
|
Senate
|
11/12/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|