Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB283 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 283


 AN ACT
 relating to the membership and activities of local school health
 advisory councils and to parental involvement in human sexuality
 instruction in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 28.004, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (d) and (i) and adding Subsections (d-1),
 (i-1), (m), (m-1), and (m-2) to read as follows:
 (d) The board of trustees shall appoint at least five
 members to the local school health advisory council. A majority of
 the members must be persons who are parents of students enrolled in
 the district and who are not employed by the district. One of those
 members shall serve as chair or co-chair of the council. The board
 of trustees also may appoint one or more persons from each of the
 following groups or a representative from a group other than a group
 specified under this subsection:
 (1) public school teachers;
 (2) public school administrators;
 (3) district students;
 (4) health care professionals;
 (5) the business community;
 (6) law enforcement;
 (7) senior citizens;
 (8) the clergy; and
 (9) nonprofit health organizations.
 (d-1)  The local school health advisory council shall meet at
 least four times each year.
 (i) Before each school year, a [A] school district shall
 provide written notice to [notify] a parent of each student
 enrolled in the district of the board of trustees' decision
 regarding whether the district will provide human sexuality
 instruction to district students. If instruction will be provided,
 the notice must include:
 (1) a summary of the basic content of the district's
 human sexuality instruction to be provided to the student,
 including a statement informing the parent of the instructional
 requirements under state law; [and]
 (2) a statement of the parent's right to:
 (A)  review curriculum materials as provided by
 Subsection (j); and
 (B) remove the student from any part of the
 district's human sexuality instruction without subjecting the
 student to any disciplinary action, academic penalty, or other
 sanction imposed by the district or the student's school; and
 (3)  information describing the opportunities for
 parental involvement in the development of the curriculum to be
 used in human sexuality instruction, including information
 regarding the local school health advisory council established
 under Subsection (a).
 (i-1)  A parent may use the grievance procedure adopted under
 Section 26.011 concerning a complaint of a violation of Subsection
 (i).
 (m)  In addition to performing other duties, the local school
 health advisory council shall submit to the board of trustees, at
 least annually, a written report that includes:
 (1)  any council recommendation concerning the school
 district's health education curriculum and instruction or related
 matters that the council has not previously submitted to the board;
 (2)  any suggested modification to a council
 recommendation previously submitted to the board; and
 (3)  a detailed explanation of the council's activities
 during the period between the date of the current report and the
 date of the last prior written report.
 (m-1)  In lieu of the report that otherwise would be required
 under Subsection (m), not later than April 1, 2010, the local school
 health advisory council shall submit to the board of trustees an
 initial written report that includes:
 (1)  any information required under Subsections (m)(1)
 and (2); and
 (2)  a detailed explanation of the council's activities
 during the 12-month period preceding the date of the report.
 (m-2)  Subsection (m-1) and this subsection expire April 30,
 2010.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 283 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 283 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor