Senate | 04/30/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1483 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 1483 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 288 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 234 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 225 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 225 | |
Senate | 02/04/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 140 | |
Senate | 01/28/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 58 | |
Senate | 01/27/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 38 | |
Senate | 11/13/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/13/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |