Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB296 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R1959 JSC-D
 By: West S.B. No. 296


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disclosure of certain payments or other transfers
 of value by manufacturers of prescription drugs, medical devices,
 and medical supplies; providing a penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle H, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 174 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 174.  REPORTING REQUIREMENTS FOR MANUFACTURERS OF
 PRESCRIPTION DRUGS, MEDICAL DEVICES, AND MEDICAL SUPPLIES
 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 174.001.  APPLICABILITY. This chapter applies to a
 manufacturer that exceeds $1 million in annual gross revenue and
 produces, prepares, compounds, converts, or processes a
 prescription drug, medical device, or medical supply for which
 payment is available through the medical assistance program under
 Chapter 32, Human Resources Code, or under Title XVIII, XIX, or XXI
 of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Sections 1395 et seq., 1396 et
 seq., and 1397aa et seq.).
 Sec. 174.002.  RULES. The attorney general shall adopt
 rules necessary to implement this chapter.
 [Sections 174.003-174.050 reserved for expansion]
 SUBCHAPTER B. REPORTING REQUIREMENTS
 Sec. 174.051.  QUARTERLY REPORT. (a) A manufacturer doing
 business in this state shall submit a report for each fiscal quarter
 to the attorney general that discloses any payment or other
 transfer of value provided directly, indirectly, or through an
 agent, subsidiary, or other third party to:
 (1) a physician;
 (2)  an entity that a physician is employed by, has
 tenure with, or has a significant ownership interest in; or
 (3)  an organization involved in health care financing,
 organization, or delivery and in which a physician is a voluntary
 paying member or through which a physician receives professional
 certification.
 (b)  For each payment or other transfer of value reported,
 the quarterly report shall list:
 (1) the name of the physician and, if applicable:
 (A)  the entity required to be listed by
 Subsection (a)(2); or
 (B)  the organization required to be listed by
 Subsection (a)(3);
 (2)  the address of the physician's office or primary
 address of the entity required to be listed by Subsection (a)(2) or
 the organization required to be listed by Subsection (a)(3);
 (3)  the facility with which the physician is
 affiliated, if any;
 (4)  the value of the payment or other transfer of
 value;
 (5)  the date on which the payment or other transfer of
 value was provided;
 (6)  a description of the nature of the payment or other
 transfer of value; and
 (7)  the purpose of the payment or other transfer of
 value.
 (c)  The following payments or other transfers of value are
 exempt from the quarterly reporting requirement:
 (1)  free samples of prescription drugs intended for
 distribution to patients;
 (2)  a transfer of anything of value to a physician who
 is a patient and not acting in the physician's professional
 capacity;
 (3)  a gift, payment, fee, subsidy, or other economic
 benefit valued at less than $25; and
 (4)  compensation paid by a manufacturer to a physician
 who is directly employed by and works solely for the manufacturer.
 (d)  A manufacturer shall submit each quarterly report
 electronically in the manner prescribed by the attorney general not
 later than the 30th day after the date the state fiscal year quarter
 ends.
 Sec. 174.052.  ANNUAL SUMMARY REPORT. (a) Not later than
 October 15 of each year, each manufacturer that is required to
 submit quarterly reports under Section 174.051 shall submit an
 annual summary report to the attorney general that:
 (1)  summarizes each submission of information under
 Section 174.051 made by the manufacturer during the previous fiscal
 year; and
 (2)  includes the aggregate amount of all transfers of
 anything of value less than $25 for the previous fiscal year.
 (b)  The manufacturer shall submit the annual summary report
 electronically in the manner prescribed by the attorney general.
 (c)  The attorney general may assess a fee for filing the
 annual summary report in an amount sufficient to recover the cost of
 administering this chapter.
 Sec. 174.053.  PUBLICATION OF REPORTS. (a) The attorney
 general shall review and make available to the public information
 reported under Sections 174.051 and 174.052.
 (b)  The attorney general shall publish the quarterly and
 annual summary reports on the attorney general's website and shall
 make printed copies of the reports available on request.
 Sec. 174.054.  REPORT TO THE LEGISLATURE. Not later than
 December 1 of each year, the attorney general shall submit a report
 to the legislature that includes:
 (1)  information collected under Sections 174.051 and
 174.052 for the preceding fiscal year; and
 (2)  a description of any action taken to enforce this
 chapter during the preceding fiscal year.
 Sec. 174.055.  CIVIL PENALTY.  (a)  A manufacturer that fails
 to report a payment or other transfer of value is liable to the
 state for a civil penalty of not less than $500 but not more than
 $2,500 for each violation, not to exceed $50,000 in one fiscal year.
 (b)  A manufacturer that fails to file a quarterly or annual
 summary report required under this subchapter is liable to the
 state for a civil penalty of not less than $5,000 but not more than
 $25,000, not to exceed $250,000 in one fiscal year.
 (c)  Each failure to report a payment or other transfer of
 value or failure to file a quarterly or annual summary report
 constitutes a separate violation.
 (d)  The attorney general may sue to collect a penalty under
 this section.
 SECTION 2. (a) The attorney general shall require the first
 quarterly report under Section 174.051, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act, to be submitted not later than December 30, 2009.
 (b) The attorney general shall require the first annual
 summary report under Section 174.052, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act, to be submitted not later than October 15, 2010.
 (c) The attorney general shall submit the first report to
 the legislature required by Section 174.054, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act, not later than December 1, 2010.
 (d) As soon as practicable after the effective date of this
 Act, the attorney general shall adopt rules required by Section
 174.002, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.