House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4354
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2864
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2864
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1997
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1889
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1889
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1889
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1889
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1889
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1831
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1831
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 1831
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1831
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1831
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 227
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 227
|
Senate
|
11/21/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|