Senate | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/18/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 228 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 228 | |
Senate | 11/21/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/21/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |