House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2425 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2425 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2133 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1874 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1736 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1736 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1736 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1736 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1735 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1735 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1735 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Ogden | Journal Page: 1735 |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1735 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1735 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 1729 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | Journal Page: 1729 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 228 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 228 | |
Senate | 11/24/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/24/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |