House | 05/23/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4315 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2864 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2864 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2430 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1997 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1928 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1928 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1928 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1928 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1928 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1928 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1928 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 Shapleigh | Journal Page: 1927 |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1926 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1926 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1877 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1298 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 229 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 229 | |
Senate | 12/02/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/02/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |