E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5980
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4512
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4154
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4154
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4154
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4154
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2572
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#967
|
Journal Page: 3990
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3990
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3990
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3913
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 3913
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3913
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1266
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1266
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1179
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Refer to s/c on Flooding & Evacuations by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 254
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 254
|
Senate
|
12/15/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|