Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB359 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 359


 AN ACT
 relating to punishment for certain offenses committed in a disaster
 area or an evacuated area.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 12, Penal Code, is amended
 by adding Section 12.50 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.50.  PENALTY IF OFFENSE COMMITTED IN DISASTER AREA
 OR EVACUATED AREA. (a)  Subject to Subsection (c), the punishment
 for an offense described by Subsection (b) is increased to the
 punishment prescribed for the next higher category of offense if it
 is shown on the trial of the offense that the offense was committed
 in an area that was, at the time of the offense:
 (1)  subject to a declaration of a state of disaster
 made by:
 (A)  the president of the United States under the
 Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act (42
 U.S.C. Section 5121 et seq.);
 (B)  the governor under Section 418.014,
 Government Code; or
 (C)  the presiding officer of the governing body
 of a political subdivision under Section 418.108, Government Code;
 or
 (2) subject to an emergency evacuation order.
 (b)  The increase in punishment authorized by this section
 applies only to an offense under:
 (1) Section 22.01;
 (2) Section 29.02;
 (3) Section 30.02; and
 (4) Section 31.03.
 (c)  If an offense listed under Subsection (b)(1) or (4) is
 punishable as a Class A misdemeanor, the minimum term of
 confinement for the offense is increased to 180 days.  If an offense
 listed under Subsection (b)(3) or (4) is punishable as a felony of
 the first degree, the punishment for that offense may not be
 increased under this section.
 (d)  It is a defense to a charge under Subsection (b)(4) that
 the conduct in question meets the elements of necessity outlined in
 Section 9.22.
 (e)  For purposes of this section, "emergency evacuation
 order" means an official statement issued by the governing body of
 this state or a political subdivision of this state to recommend or
 require the evacuation of all or part of the population of an area
 stricken or threatened with a disaster.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect at the time the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 359 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 359 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor