House
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 805
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 618
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
West
|
Journal Page: 591
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
See remarks
|
Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
Shapleigh
|
Journal Page: 521
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 521
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 521
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Fraser
|
Journal Page: 520
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 520
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Point of order overruled
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 464
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Set as special order
|
3/16/09
|
Journal Page: 464
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 442
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 464
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 288
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Referred to Committee of the Whole
|
|
Journal Page: 255
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 255
|
Senate
|
12/15/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|