House | 04/06/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1067 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 843 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 843 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 843 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 843 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 843 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 843 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 843 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 255 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 255 | |
Senate | 12/15/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/15/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |