Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB368 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Carona S.B. No. 368


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the denial, suspension, or revocation of a motor
 vehicle inspection station certificate or an inspector
 certificate.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 548.405, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (a-1), (a-2), (a-3), and (a-4) and amending
 Subsection (b) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The department shall deny a person's application for
 an inspection station certificate or revoke an inspection station
 certificate if the applicant, the certificate holder, or the owner
 of the inspection station has been convicted of a felony under the
 laws of this state, another state, or the United States during the
 seven years preceding the date the application was filed or the date
 the certificate is revoked.
 (a-2)  The department shall deny a person's application for
 an inspector certificate or revoke an inspector certificate if the
 applicant or certificate holder has been convicted of a felony
 under the laws of this state, another state, or the United States
 during the seven years preceding the date the application was filed
 or the date the certificate is revoked.
 (a-3)  A felony conviction may not be grounds for a denial or
 revocation under Subsection (a-1) or (a-2) unless the offense
 involved fraud, a deceptive trade practice, a misrepresentation, a
 deceptive business practice, extortion, bribery, a breach of a
 fiduciary duty, counterfeiting, or the falsification of a
 government document.
 (a-4)  Beginning September 1, 2009, the Dallas County
 Sheriff's Office shall track and monitor the number of citations
 issued in this state to operators of motor vehicles on which a
 counterfeit or fraudulent inspection certificate is displayed. Not
 later than July 1, 2015, the Dallas County Sheriff's Office shall
 submit a report to the department on the total number of such
 citations issued between September 1, 2009, and June 1, 2015. If
 the department determines that the number of reported citations
 does not indicate a decrease in the frequency of fraudulent
 inspections, not later than July 1, 2015, the department shall
 issue an order stating that determination. If the department
 issues such an order, this subsection and Subsections (a), (a-1),
 (a-2), (a-3), and (b) expire September 1, 2015.
 (b) For purposes of Subsections (a)(7), (a-1), and (a-2)
 [Subsection (a)(7)], a person is convicted of an offense if a court
 enters against the person an adjudication of the person's guilt,
 including an order of probation or deferred adjudication.
 SECTION 2. (a) Effective September 1, 2015, Subsection
 (b), Section 548.405, Transportation Code, is reenacted to read as
 follows:
 (b) For purposes of Subsection (a)(7), a person is convicted
 of an offense if a court enters against the person an adjudication
 of the person's guilt, including an order of probation or deferred
 adjudication.
 (b) Subsection (a) of this section takes effect only if the
 Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas issues an order
 under Subsection (a-4), Section 548.405, Transportation Code, as
 added by this Act. If the Department of Public Safety of the State
 of Texas does not issue an order under Subsection (a-4), Section
 548.405, Transportation Code, as added by this Act, Subsection (a)
 of this section has no effect.
 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 548.405, Transportation Code, that relate to an applicant for an
 inspection station certificate or an inspector certificate, apply
 only to an applicant who files an application on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An applicant for an inspection station
 certificate or an inspector certificate who filed an application
 before the effective date of this Act is covered by the law in
 effect on the date the application was filed and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.