House | 04/16/2009 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 1266 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1266 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1123 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 887 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 887 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 887 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 887 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 887 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 887 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 887 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 821 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 257 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 257 | |
Senate | 12/19/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/19/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |