Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB399 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Seliger S.B. No. 399
 (In the Senate - Filed January 5, 2009; February 17, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural
 Affairs; April 1, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 1, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to abolishing the office of inspector of hides and
 animals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. (a) The office of inspector of hides and
 animals is abolished.
 (b) Any records in the custody of an inspector of hides and
 animals are transferred to the county clerk of the county
 previously served by the inspector.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (e), Section 52.092, Election Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (e) County offices shall be listed in the following order:
 (1) county judge;
 (2) judge, county court at law;
 (3) judge, county criminal court;
 (4) judge, county probate court;
 (5) county attorney;
 (6) district clerk;
 (7) district and county clerk;
 (8) county clerk;
 (9) sheriff;
 (10) sheriff and tax assessor-collector;
 (11) county tax assessor-collector;
 (12) county treasurer;
 (13) county school trustee (county with population of
 3.3 million or more);
 (14) county surveyor[;
 [(15) inspector of hides and animals].
 SECTION 3. Subsection (a), Section 172.024, Election Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The filing fee for a candidate for nomination in the
 general primary election is as follows:
 (1) United States senator $5,000
 (2) office elected statewide, except United States
 senator 3,750
 (3) United States representative 3,125
 (4) state senator 1,250
 (5) state representative 750
 (6) member, State Board of Education 300
 (7) chief justice or justice, court of appeals, other
 than a justice specified by Subdivision (8) 1,875
 (8) chief justice or justice of a court of appeals that
 serves a court of appeals district in which a county with a
 population of more than 750,000 is wholly or partly
 situated 2,500
 (9) district judge or judge specified by Section
 52.092(d) for which this schedule does not otherwise prescribe a
 fee 1,500
 (10) district or criminal district judge of a court in
 a judicial district wholly contained in a county with a population
 of more than 850,000 2,500
 (11) judge, statutory county court, other than a judge
 specified by Subdivision (12) 1,500
 (12) judge of a statutory county court in a county with
 a population of more than 850,000 2,500
 (13) district attorney, criminal district attorney,
 or county attorney performing the duties of a district
 attorney 1,250
 (14) county commissioner, district clerk, county
 clerk, sheriff, county tax assessor-collector, county treasurer,
 or judge, constitutional county court:
 (A) county with a population of 200,000 or
 more 1,250
 (B) county with a population of under
 200,000 750
 (15) justice of the peace or constable:
 (A) county with a population of 200,000 or
 more 1,000
 (B) county with a population of under
 200,000 375
 (16) county surveyor[, inspector of hides and
 animals,] or public weigher 75
 (17) office of the county government for which this
 schedule does not otherwise prescribe a fee 750
 SECTION 4. Section 87.012, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 87.012. OFFICERS SUBJECT TO REMOVAL. The district
 judge may, under this subchapter, remove from office:
 (1) a district attorney;
 (2) a county attorney;
 (3) a county judge;
 (4) a county commissioner;
 (5) a county clerk;
 (6) a district clerk;
 (7) a district and county clerk;
 (8) a county treasurer;
 (9) a sheriff;
 (10) a county surveyor;
 (11) a county tax assessor-collector;
 (12) a constable;
 (13) [an inspector of hides and animals;
 [(14)] a justice of the peace; and
 (14) [(15)] a county officer, not otherwise named by
 this section, whose office is created under the constitution or
 other law of this state.
 SECTION 5. Subsection (a), Section 87.041, Local Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The commissioners court of a county may fill a vacancy
 in the office of:
 (1) county judge;
 (2) county clerk;
 (3) district and county clerk;
 (4) sheriff;
 (5) county attorney;
 (6) county treasurer;
 (7) county surveyor;
 (8) [inspector of hides and animals;
 [(9)] county tax assessor-collector;
 (9) [(10)] justice of the peace; or
 (10) [(11)] constable.
 SECTION 6. Sections 148.044, 148.067, and 148.068,
 Agriculture Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *