Senate | 03/19/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 500 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 438 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 258 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 258 | |
Senate | 01/05/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/05/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |