1 | 1 | | By: Seliger S.B. No. 401 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed January 5, 2009; February 17, 2009, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Education; |
---|
4 | 4 | | March 9, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 9, 2009, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 401 By: Averitt |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to eligibility for the small and mid-sized district |
---|
13 | 13 | | adjustment under the public school finance system. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 42.2516, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
16 | 16 | | amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (h-2) to read as |
---|
17 | 17 | | follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) Subject to Subsections (b-1), (b-2), (f-1), (g), [and] |
---|
19 | 19 | | (h), and (h-2), but notwithstanding any other provision of this |
---|
20 | 20 | | title, a school district is entitled to state revenue necessary to |
---|
21 | 21 | | provide the district with the sum of: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (1) the amount of state revenue necessary to maintain |
---|
23 | 23 | | state and local revenue per student in weighted average daily |
---|
24 | 24 | | attendance in the amount equal to the greater of: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (A) the amount of state and local revenue per |
---|
26 | 26 | | student in weighted average daily attendance for the maintenance |
---|
27 | 27 | | and operations of the district available to the district for the |
---|
28 | 28 | | 2005-2006 school year; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (B) the amount of state and local revenue per |
---|
30 | 30 | | student in weighted average daily attendance for the maintenance |
---|
31 | 31 | | and operations of the district to which the district would have been |
---|
32 | 32 | | entitled for the 2006-2007 school year under this chapter, as it |
---|
33 | 33 | | existed on January 1, 2006, or, if the district would have been |
---|
34 | 34 | | subject to Chapter 41, as that chapter existed on January 1, 2006, |
---|
35 | 35 | | the amount to which the district would have been entitled under that |
---|
36 | 36 | | chapter, based on the funding elements in effect for the 2005-2006 |
---|
37 | 37 | | school year, if the district imposed a maintenance and operations |
---|
38 | 38 | | tax at the rate adopted by the district for the 2005 tax year; or |
---|
39 | 39 | | (C) the amount of state and local revenue per |
---|
40 | 40 | | student in weighted average daily attendance for the maintenance |
---|
41 | 41 | | and operations of the district to which the district would have been |
---|
42 | 42 | | entitled for the 2006-2007 school year under this chapter, as it |
---|
43 | 43 | | existed on January 1, 2006, or, if the district would have been |
---|
44 | 44 | | subject to Chapter 41, as that chapter existed on January 1, 2006, |
---|
45 | 45 | | the amount to which the district would have been entitled under that |
---|
46 | 46 | | chapter, based on the funding elements in effect for the 2005-2006 |
---|
47 | 47 | | school year, if the district imposed a maintenance and operations |
---|
48 | 48 | | tax at the rate equal to the rate described by Section 26.08(i) or |
---|
49 | 49 | | (k)(1), Tax Code, as applicable, for the 2006 tax year; |
---|
50 | 50 | | (2) an amount equal to the product of $2,500 |
---|
51 | 51 | | multiplied by the number of classroom teachers, full-time |
---|
52 | 52 | | librarians, full-time counselors certified under Subchapter B, |
---|
53 | 53 | | Chapter 21, and full-time school nurses employed by the district |
---|
54 | 54 | | and entitled to a minimum salary under Section 21.402; and |
---|
55 | 55 | | (3) an amount equal to the product of $275 multiplied |
---|
56 | 56 | | by the number of students in average daily attendance in grades nine |
---|
57 | 57 | | through 12 in the district. |
---|
58 | 58 | | (h-2) Notwithstanding any other provision of this code, the |
---|
59 | 59 | | repeal of Section 42.103(e) by S.B. No. 401, Acts of the 81st |
---|
60 | 60 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, may not increase the amount of |
---|
61 | 61 | | state and local funds to which a school district is entitled under |
---|
62 | 62 | | Subsection (b). |
---|
63 | 63 | | SECTION 2. Subsection (e), Section 42.103, Education Code, |
---|
64 | 64 | | is repealed. |
---|
65 | 65 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
66 | 66 | | * * * * * |
---|